Franck v. Bannock County et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Franck
Defendant: Bannock County, Tovey Terrel, Sheri Davies, Ernie Moser, Steve Brown and Terrel Tovey
Case Number: 4:2019cv00249
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bannock County, Steve Brown, Sheri Davies, Ernie Moser, Terrel Tovey.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/29/2019.(Hall, Blake)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kevin Franck. Replies due by 8/30/2019.(Schuster, Lance)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Blake G Hall appearing for Defendants Bannock County, Steve Brown, Sheri Davies, Ernie Moser, Terrel Tovey. Responses due by 8/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hall, Blake)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Franck. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brown Proof of Service, #2 Davies Proof of Service, #3 Moser Proof of Service, #4 Tovey Proof of Service)(Schuster, Lance)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Terrel Tovey. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Ernie Moser, #2 Summons Sheri Davies, #3 Summons Steve Brown)(jd)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1908107.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Schuster, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franck v. Bannock County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bannock County
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tovey Terrel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Davies
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie Moser
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Brown
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrel Tovey
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Franck
Represented By: Lance J Schuster
Represented By: Jared Wayne Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?