Hoge v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Merril Hoge, Monsanto Co. and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00252
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Receipt of docs by N District of California re #5 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel, (jp)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel, confirmation of electronic transfer to MDL 2741 (jp)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for N. District of California (MDL No. 2741) (Attachments: #1 email reflecting MDL text entry - stay is lifted, #2 email of Text Only Entry transferring case)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- CTO-144 for MDL 2741 (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merril Hoge. Monsanto Company served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Beck, Robert)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merril Hoge ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1908478.), filed by Merril Hoge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Beck, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoge v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merril Hoge
Represented By: Robert K Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monsanto Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?