Morgan v. Stevenson et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Jade Morgan
Defendant: State of Idaho Sixth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Bannock et al, State of Idaho Fifth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Minidoka et al and Lance Stevenson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00297
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State of Idaho Fifth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Minidoka et al, State of Idaho Sixth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Bannock et al, Lance Stevenson.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/29/2019.(Hall, Blake)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dustin Jade Morgan. Replies due by 9/10/2019.(jp)
August 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement, re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (jp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Blake G Hall appearing for Defendants State of Idaho Fifth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Minidoka et al, State of Idaho Sixth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Bannock et al, Lance Stevenson. Responses due by 9/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hall, Blake)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Jade Morgan. Lance Stevenson served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (jp)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Jade Morgan. State of Idaho Fifth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Minidoka et al served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (jp)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Jade Morgan. State of Idaho Sixth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Bannock et al served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (jp)
July 30, 2019 RECEIPT: check Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt # IDX400000792 (pr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Dustin Jade Morgan. (pr)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (pr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Summons Issued, filed by Dustin Jade Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Idaho Statutory Form Power of Attorney)(pr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #2 Issued Summonses) (pr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Stevenson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho Sixth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Bannock et al
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho Fifth Judicial District Court in and for the County of Minidoka et al
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Stevenson
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Jade Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?