Vargas v. Saul
Plaintiff: Josefina Vargas
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00299
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josefina Vargas. Andrew Saul served on 8/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Osterhout, Karl)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall be allowed to proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (jd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Josefina Vargas Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Karl E Osterhout. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1919919.)Greg J Maeser appearing for Plaintiff Josefina Vargas. Responses due by 8/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Maeser, Greg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Greg J Maeser appearing for Plaintiff Josefina Vargas. Responses due by 8/22/2019 (Maeser, Greg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Josefina Vargas This is a sealed document.. (Maeser, Greg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Josefina Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Maeser, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Vargas
Represented By: Greg J Maeser
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?