Filiatrault v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Letawnya Filiatrault
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP, John Does 1-100 and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00302
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: Robert H Whaley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Robert H. Whaley. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00302-RHW on all future pleadings. (st)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Robert H. Whaley from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Letawnya Filiatrault. Monsanto Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (ckh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Letawnya Filiatrault. Bayer CropScience LP served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (ckh)
August 2, 2019 RECEIPT: Check Fee Received $ 400, receipt # IDX400000793 Final Payment (ad)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Summons Issued, filed by Letawnya Filiatrault. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Filiatrault v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letawnya Filiatrault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?