VNS Federal Services, LLC v. Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC
Plaintiff: VNS Federal Services, LLC
Defendant: Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00318
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #15 and #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Stephen P Withee,John S Higgins for VNS Federal Services, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John S. Higgins. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1948939.)John A Bailey, Jr appearing for Plaintiff VNS Federal Services, LLC. Responses due by 10/25/2019 (Bailey, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephen P. Withee. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1948934.)John A Bailey, Jr appearing for Plaintiff VNS Federal Services, LLC. Responses due by 10/25/2019 (Bailey, John)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF LITIGATION PLAN AND DISCOVERY PLAN. NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. ( Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Stipulated Proposed litigation and discovery plans must be filed on or before 10/22/19.) Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Supplemental Verification of Records and Proceedings in State Court Action. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Greenberg, Benjamin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. (Greenberg, Benjamin)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #8 , #9 and #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Ivan Boatner,Nicholas W. Diegel and Benjamin Greenberg for Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Ivan Boatner. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1928897.)J Michael Keyes appearing for Defendant Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Keyes, J)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Nicholas Diegel. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1928891.)J Michael Keyes appearing for Defendant Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Keyes, J)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Benjamin Greenberg. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1928878.)J Michael Keyes appearing for Defendant Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Keyes, J)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. (Keyes, J)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of J. Michael Keyes filed by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL PLEADINGS. (Keyes, J)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC CERTIFYING FILING NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT. (Keyes, J)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC, VNS Federal Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/15/2019. (jp)
August 15, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC served on 8/15/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jp)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of J. Michael Keyes Verifying State Court Records and Proceedings re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- ROA, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint)(Keyes, J) Modified on 8/16/2019 to edit text (jp).
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Dean P. Vanek re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Keyes, J)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC of Civil Action to United States District Court from District Court, Seventh Judicial Court, Bonneville County, case number CV10-19-5108.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1927024.), filed by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint)(Keyes, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VNS Federal Services, LLC v. Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC
Represented By: J Michael Keyes
Represented By: Ivan Boatner
Represented By: Benjamin Greenberg
Represented By: Nicholas W. Diegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VNS Federal Services, LLC
Represented By: John S Higgins
Represented By: John A Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Stephen P Withee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?