Gadish v. Johnson Mark, LLC
Plaintiff: John Gadish
Defendant: Johnson Mark, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00342
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by John Gadish. (Ducar, Timothy)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 DISCOVERY PLAN by John Gadish . (Ducar, Timothy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF LITIGATION PLAN AND DISCOVERY PLAN, NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts the Courtroom Deputy, Lynette Case, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct an initial scheduling conference by telephone on NOVEMBER 5, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (MTN. TIME), to discuss the entry of a scheduling order to govern the case going forward. Stipulated Proposed litigation and discovery plans must be filed on or before OCTOBER 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for John Gadish and counsel for Johnson Mark, LLC re #4 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/3/2019. (jd)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson Mark, LLC.(Bonnesen, Jon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial for Violations of FDCPA served on Leo Rodriguez on September 12, 2019, filed by John Gadish. (Ducar, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Johnson Mark, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT John Gadish against Johnson Mark, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1935809.), filed by John Gadish. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons)(Ducar, Timothy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/6/2019 with a PDF that cannot be edited.) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gadish v. Johnson Mark, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Mark, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gadish
Represented By: Timothy D Ducar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?