Securities and Exchange Commission v. Yellowstone Partners, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Cameron G High, David H Hansen, YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC, Cameron G. High and David Henry Hansen
Case Number: 4:2019cv00374
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 2/28/2020. (jd)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STAYING CASE - The Court will grant the motion to stay. On or before February 28, 2020, Plaintiff must file a status report with the Court indicating whether the criminal matter has been resolved and whether the stay should be continued. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay the Case (Unopposed) David Whipple appearing for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Whipple, David)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Yellowstone Partners, LLC waiver sent on 10/10/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Whipple, David)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #8 and #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Eric G Benson and Z. Ryan Pahnke for Yellowstone Partners, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Eric G. Benson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1955663.)Elaina M Maragakis appearing for Defendant Yellowstone Partners, LLC. Responses due by 11/7/2019 (Maragakis, Elaina)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Z. Ryan Pahnke. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1955321.)Elaina M Maragakis appearing for Defendant Yellowstone Partners, LLC. Responses due by 11/7/2019 (Maragakis, Elaina)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Securities and Exchange Commission, Yellowstone Partners, LLC re #6 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/16/2019. (jd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaina M Maragakis on behalf of Yellowstone Partners, LLC (Maragakis, Elaina)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT CAMERON G. HIGH. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. David Henry Hansen waiver sent on 10/10/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Whipple, David)
October 1, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: #2 Stipulation filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Counsel for defendants should file a motion for pro hac vice if they are out of state. (jd)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 High, #2 Yellowstone)(jd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION Consent (to Entry of Final Judgment) of Cameron G. High by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Final Judgment as to Cameron G. High)(Oliver, Amy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David H Hansen, Cameron G High, YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Yellowstone Partners, LLC, #3 Summons David Henry Hansen, #4 Summons Cameron G. High)(Oliver, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Yellowstone Partners, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron G High
Represented By: Erik A Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Hansen
Represented By: Michael R MacPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YELLOWSTONE PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Brett L Tolman
Represented By: Eric G Benson
Represented By: Z. Ryan Pehnke
Represented By: Z. Ryan Pahnke
Represented By: Elaina M Maragakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron G. High
Represented By: Erik A Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Henry Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Amy J Oliver
Represented By: David Whipple
Represented By: Cheryl M Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?