Big Bam Vapes LLC, et al. v. Mesa Underwriters Specialty Ins. Co. et al.
Plaintiff: LOGAN CHECKETTS, EVAPORATED TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, BIG BAM VAPES, LLC, Evaporated Technologies LLC and Big Bam Vapes LLC
Defendant: BIG SKY UNDERWRITERS and MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00378
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Big Sky Underwriters.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/29/2019.(Scanlan, Kevin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Big Bam Vapes LLC, Logan Checketts, Evaporated Technologies LLC. Replies due by 11/27/2019.(Atkin, Blake)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Kevin J Scanlan appearing for Defendant BIG SKY UNDERWRITERS. Responses due by 11/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Scanlan, Kevin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for BIG BAM VAPES, LLC, LOGAN CHECKETTS and EVAPORATED TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, and sent to counsel for MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/3/2019. (jd)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(Guadagno, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Summons, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Case Information Cover Sheet)(Guadagno, Michael)
October 2, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal. The filing party shall re-submit their state court documents, as well as the state court register of actions using the supplement event in ECF.(jd)
October 2, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Guadagno, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Guadagno, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from Bannock County District Court, case number CV03-19-03319.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1947215.), filed by MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 State Court Complaint)(Guadagno, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Bam Vapes LLC, et al. v. Mesa Underwriters Specialty Ins. Co. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOGAN CHECKETTS
Represented By: Blake S Atkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVAPORATED TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: Blake S Atkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIG BAM VAPES, LLC
Represented By: Blake S Atkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evaporated Technologies LLC
Represented By: Blake S Atkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Bam Vapes LLC
Represented By: Blake S Atkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG SKY UNDERWRITERS
Represented By: Kevin J Scanlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MESA UNDERWRITERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael A Guadagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?