Peterson v. Golden Valley Natural, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Theresa E. Peterson
Defendant: Jeff Peters and Golden Valley Natural, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00388
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #12 Disclosure Statement (Defendants' Initial Disclosures) filed by Golden Valley Natural, LLC, Jeff Peters was filed incorrectly in this case. For future reference, pursuant to Local Rule 5.4 Non-Filing of Discovery, discovery documents must be served upon other counsel and parties but must not be filed with the Clerk of Court unless on order of the court or for use in the proceeding.(jp)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement filed byDavid Anthony Eisele on behalf of Golden Valley Natural, LLC, Jeff Peters. (Eisele, David)
November 12, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Order dkt 11, Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/4/2020 02:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. (jp)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Telephonic scheduling conference held 11/12/19. Dispositive Motions due by 11/13/2020. Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 2/4/2020. Mediation shall take place by 5/31/2020. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/4/20 at 2:00 PM Mountain Time - Telephonic Hearing Courtroom 6. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 DISCOVERY PLAN by Theresa E. Peterson . (Larsen, Reed)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Theresa E. Peterson. (Larsen, Reed)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on November 12, 2019, at 11:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before November 5, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Golden Valley Natural, LLC.(Eisele, David)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF VACATED HEARING: Due to the reassignment of this case, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for November 19, 2019 before Judge Winmill is vacated. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be reset by a separate order. (jlb)
October 10, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale for all further proceedings. Judge B. Lynn Winmill no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-cv-388-CWD (alw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on November 19, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9145 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before November 12, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/9/2019. (ckh)
October 7, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Golden Valley Natural, LLC served on 10/7/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only as to Jeff Peters) (ckh)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Valley Natural, LLC. (Eisele, David)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeff Peters, Golden Valley Natural, LLC from Bingham County Idaho District Court, case number CV06-19-1583.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1949775.), filed by Jeff Peters, Golden Valley Natural, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint Complaint and Summons - Golden Valley Natural, LLC, #4 Summons Summons - Jeff Peters, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Golden Valley Natural, LLC, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Jeff Peters, #7 Errata State Court Docket Sheet)(Eisele, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Golden Valley Natural, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Peters
Represented By: David Anthony Eisele
Represented By: Steven J Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Valley Natural, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Eisele
Represented By: Steven J Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa E. Peterson
Represented By: Reed W Larsen
Represented By: Javier L Gabiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?