Moreno v. Saul
Plaintiff: Michelle Yvonne Moreno
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00411
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Michelle Yvonne Moreno and Andrew Saul re #11 Notice of Appearance and #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/7/2020. (ckh)
December 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Lewinger Toma on behalf of Andrew Saul (Toma, Alexis)
December 2, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Per the green card attached to dkt #10 indicating USAG was served on 11/26/19, Respondent's correct answer due date is 2/24/2020. (jp)
November 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Yvonne Moreno. Andrew Saul served on 11/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gerrard, Josephine)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING IFP STATUS re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's In Forma Pauperis Application (Docket No. #3 ) is GRANTED, and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Josephine M Gerrard for Michelle Yvonne Moreno. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 ERRATA by Plaintiff Michelle Yvonne Moreno re #4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Josephine M. Gerrard. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1959368.) . (Pingel, Todd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
October 25, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - re #4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Josephine M. Gerrard. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1959368.) filed by Michelle Yvonne Moreno. Both the applicant for pro hac vice admission and the designated co-counsel must sign the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed with the Court. Please resubmit Ms. Gerrard's application form as an Errata and link it to the original application at docket #4 to avoid paying the application fee again. Pro hac counsel will be added to the case at the time the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice is processed and approved. (ckh)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Josephine M. Gerrard. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1959368.)Todd D Pingel appearing for Plaintiff Michelle Yvonne Moreno. Responses due by 11/14/2019 (Pingel, Todd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 First APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Todd D Pingel appearing for Plaintiff Michelle Yvonne Moreno. Responses due by 11/14/2019 (Pingel, Todd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Michelle Yvonne Moreno This is a sealed document.. (Pingel, Todd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Michelle Yvonne Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Pingel, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Represented By: Alexis Lewinger Toma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Yvonne Moreno
Represented By: Todd D Pingel
Represented By: Josephine Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?