Hong v. Recreational Equipment Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tony Hong
Defendant: Samuel Krieg, Does 1-10 and Recreational Equipment Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00435
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Stephen M. Lobbin for Samuel Krieg and for Recreational Equipment Inc Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER Telephonic scheduling conference held on 1/9/20. ( Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2020. Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2020. Mediation shall take place by 5/1/2020. Discovery due by 9/10/2020.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 8, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Lobbin. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1992634.)Scott David Swanson appearing for Defendants Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc. Responses due by 1/29/2020 (Swanson, Scott)
January 8, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott David Swanson on behalf of Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc (Swanson, Scott)
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Tony Hong. (Ardalan, Joanna)
January 3, 2020 Filing 29 DISCOVERY PLAN by Tony Hong . (Ardalan, Joanna)
December 20, 2019 Filing 28 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Christopher Lee for Tony Hong Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
December 18, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher Lee. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1985826.)Ryan Thomas McFarland appearing for Plaintiff Tony Hong. Responses due by 1/8/2020 (McFarland, Ryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 26 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney John Tehranian for Tony Hong Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
December 10, 2019 Filing 25 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Joanna Ardalan Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John Tehranian. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1981432.)Ryan Thomas McFarland appearing for Plaintiff Tony Hong. Responses due by 12/31/2019 (McFarland, Ryan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Joanna Ardalan. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1980914.)Ryan Thomas McFarland appearing for Plaintiff Tony Hong. Responses due by 12/30/2019 (McFarland, Ryan)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before January 3, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright number VA 2-022-677 (Notice sent to USPTO). (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ckh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 All out of state counsel continuing representation need to obtain local counsel and file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. Please see Local Rule, Civil Rule 83.4 Bar Admission e) Pro Hac Vice/Local Counsel and ECF Procedures 3. Registration, Logins and Passwords. B. Limited Registered Participants. 1. (ckh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-00951. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and declining to rule in part Defendant's #8 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue. The court grants Defendants' motion to transfer venue to the District of Idaho, and declines to rule on Defendants; motion to dismiss in deference to the district court in the District of Idaho. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)The Clerk will transfer this case to the District of Idaho by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing.
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *1-5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 1/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 10/22/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/29/2020, Motions due by 8/28/2020, Discovery completed by 9/28/2020, Dispositive motions due by 10/27/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/27/2020, Motions in Limine due by 12/14/2020, Pretrial Order due by 1/4/2021, Deposition Designations due by 1/6/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/19/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/19/2021. (AD)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3-5 days. Filed by Plaintiff Tony Hong.(Ardalan, Joanna)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Samuel Krieg in Support of Motion to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue filed by Defendants Does 1-10, Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue (Kazemba, David)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Defendants Does 1-10, Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue (Kazemba, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of JOANNA ARDALAN filed by Plaintiff Tony Hong re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Riojas, Rogelio)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Tony Hong, to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Riojas, Rogelio)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joanna Ardalan for Plaintiff Tony Hong, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joanna Ardalan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Tony Hong (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5901373 (Riojas, Rogelio)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/30/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/13/2019. (AD)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendants Does 1-10, Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel Krieg in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/13/2019, (Kazemba, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Recreational Equipment Inc (Kazemba, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David A Kazemba on behalf of Defendants Does 1-10, Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc. (Kazemba, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Recreational Equipment, Inc. on 6/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff Tony Hong. (Riojas, Rogelio)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (SNP)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
June 19, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5812856), filed by Tony Hong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons Recreational Equipment Inc., #5 Summons Samuel Krieg, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riojas, Rogelio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hong v. Recreational Equipment Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hong
Represented By: Joanna Ardalan
Represented By: Rogelio Omar Riojas
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Represented By: Ryan Thomas McFarland
Represented By: John Tehranian
Represented By: Christopher Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Krieg
Represented By: David A Kazemba
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Represented By: Scott David Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: David A Kazemba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recreational Equipment Inc
Represented By: David A Kazemba
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Represented By: Scott David Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?