Brandstetter v. Muse Event Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carter A Brandstetter
Defendant: William Davies, Muse Event Management, LLC and William "Will" Davies
Case Number: 4:2019cv00473
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Carter A Brandstetter and counsel for William "Will" Davies and Muse Event Management, LLC re #6 Answer to Complaint #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/24/2020. (jd)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Muse Event Management, LLC. (Perkins, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Answer and Demand for Jury Trial ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by William "Will" Davies, Muse Event Management, LLC.(Perkins, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carter A Brandstetter. William "Will" Davies served on 12/28/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Carey, Donald)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carter A Brandstetter. Muse Event Management, LLC served on 12/28/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Carey, Donald)
December 13, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case was reassigned to Judge William Young. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00473-WGY on all future pleadings. (st)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge William G Young from the District of Massachusetts. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William "Will" Davies and to Muse Event Management, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Muse Summons)(jd)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1978033.), filed by Carter A Brandstetter. (Attachments: #1 Summons Muse Event Management, LLC, #2 Summons William Davies, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Carey, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandstetter v. Muse Event Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter A Brandstetter
Represented By: Donald F Carey
Represented By: Lindsey Rae Romankiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muse Event Management, LLC
Represented By: David S Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William "Will" Davies
Represented By: David S Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?