Bistodeau v. USA
Petitioner: Chanel Lynn Bistodeau
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00167
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Complete RDAP by Petitioner Chanel Lynn Bistodeau. Responses due by 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (ckh)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum In Support of 2255 Motion re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Chanel Lynn Bistodeau. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (ckh)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Petition and Affidavit for Post Conviction Relief ( Criminal Action 4:17-cr-00100-BLW-2.) filed by Chanel Lynn Bistodeau. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Facts in Support of Post-Conviction Petition) (ckh)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Petitioners Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence under 2255 (Crim. Dkt. 87, Civ. Dkt. #1 ) is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Chanel Bistodeau (sent copies of docket sheets for this case and 4:17-cr-100-BLW). (ckh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) ( Criminal Action 4:17-cr-00100-BLW-2) filed by Chanel Lynn Bistodeau. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bistodeau v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Blythe H McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chanel Lynn Bistodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?