Newman v. Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Newman
Defendant: National Mortgage Resources, Inc. and Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00178
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDING. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION "Stipulation to Stay Proceeding" by Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC. (Taggart, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Steven L Taggart for Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC added. Attorney Robert J Maynes terminated. Request to Turn Electronic Noticing OFF (no longer receive NEFs in this case only) by Attorney (Taggart, Steven)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #7 Objection filed by Steven Newman . (Smith, Thomas)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 JOINDER by Defendant National Mortgage Resources, Inc. joining #7 Objection to 3 Specific Items in 7/8/20 Report of Recommendation of Bankruptcy Court, to U.S. District Court, Re. NMR's Summary Judgment Motion. (Tucker, Brian)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Objection by Defendant Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC to. Related document: #6 Order,.(March, Kathleen)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO THE DISTRICT COURT RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge (Chief Bk) Joseph M Meier. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (BK 19-40023-JMM and Adv 19-08045-JMM)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Reference is GRANTED to the extent defendants seek withdrawal when the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial. The bankruptcy court will preside over all pretrial matters in this case, including discovery and pretrial conferences, and will resolve routine and dispositive motions. If either party files a dispositive motion, the bankruptcy court will entertain that motion and submit proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law, and a recommendation for disposition to this Court. If and when it becomes clear that a trial will be necessary, and the case is prepared and ready for trial to begin, the bankruptcy court shall so certify to this court and the reference will be withdrawn at that time. Until the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceeding in bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 JOINDER by Defendant National Mortgage Resources, Inc. joining #3 Reply to Response to Motion. (ckh)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 REPLY to Response in Opposition to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/14/2020. (ckh)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Steven Newman. Replies due by 4/27/2020. (ckh)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Defendant Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC. Responses due by 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 National Mortgage Resources, Inc.'s Joinder in Motion to Withdraw Reference, #2 Adversary Proceeding Docket Sheet) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Mortgage Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T Tucker
Represented By: Nathan John Cuoio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen P March
Represented By: Robert J Maynes
Represented By: Steven L Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Newman
Represented By: Thomas Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?