Hines v. Maverik, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shaylyn Hines
Defendant: Maverik, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00185
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Maverik, Inc..(Palmer, Jennifer)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maverik, Inc.. (Palmer, Jennifer)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Shaylyn Hines and Maverik, Inc. re #1 Complaint and #4 Stipulation. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/3/2020. (ckh)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Matthew M Durham for Maverik, Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
June 1, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Maverik, Inc. answer due 6/9/2020. (ckh)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER ADOPTING #4 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (dg)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Matthew M. Durham. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2054839.)Jennifer Shearer Palmer appearing for Defendant Maverik, Inc.. Responses due by 6/22/2020 (Palmer, Jennifer)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Maverik, Inc.. (Palmer, Jennifer)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylyn Hines. Maverik, Inc. served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Dustin, Ryan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Maverik, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Maverik, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2036967.), filed by Shaylyn Hines. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dustin, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Maverik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maverik, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M Durham
Represented By: Jennifer Shearer Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaylyn Hines
Represented By: Ryan S. Dustin
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?