Mickelsen v. College of Eastern Idaho Foundation, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Kristy A. Mickelsen
Defendant: John and Jane Does I-XX and College of Eastern Idaho Foundation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00189
Filed: April 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to College of Eastern Idaho Foundation, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Application for Leave to Proceed In FormaPauperis (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Emailed order to Finance Dept.)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Please use case number 4:20-cv-00189-BLW for all future filings. (jd)
April 18, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis of Kristy Mickelsen re #1 Complaint filed by Kristy A. Mickelsen In Forma Pauperis Application. (Johnson, Eileen) Modified on 4/20/2020, to change event from "Affidavit" to motion for IFP (jd).
April 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against College of Eastern Idaho Foundation, Inc., filed by Kristy A. Mickelsen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Johnson, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mickelsen v. College of Eastern Idaho Foundation, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy A. Mickelsen
Represented By: Brian A Ertz
Represented By: Eileen R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does I-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College of Eastern Idaho Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?