Scalia v. Katsilometes
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: George W Katsilometes
Case Number: 4:2020cv00371
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by George W Katsilometes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Schuster, Lance)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance J Schuster on behalf of George W Katsilometes (Schuster, Lance)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Service filed by Eugene Scalia . (Magness, Natasha)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 10/13/2020 09:00 AM in Video - Pocatello to Other (Mountain Time) before Judge David C. Nye. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause On Secretary of Labors Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum Natasha Magness appearing for Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. Responses due by 8/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Supplement Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Petition, #4 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Petition, #5 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Petition, #6 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Magness, Natasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Katsilometes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Natasha Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W Katsilometes
Represented By: Lance J Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?