Waters v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Linda Skye Waters
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2020cv00382
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Skye Waters. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Parkinson, Brad)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: ALL MATTERS in the above case are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Judge Bush is directed to conduct all necessary and proper proceedings pertaining thereto. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)
August 27, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 4:20-cv-00382-DCN. (ckh)
August 27, 2020 The 21 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (ckh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 US Attorney General Summons, #2 US Attorney's Office Summons) (ckh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Linda Skye Waters re #2 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/26/2020. (ckh)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Linda Skye Waters This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Linda Skye Waters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Parkinson, Brad)
August 3, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Linda Skye Waters, was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-submit the initiating documents using the Petition for Review event. When refiling, please indicate the filing is made in forma pauperis so that you are not charged another filing fee. Also, please submit the Statement of Social Security Number as a separate document using the Statement of Social Security Number event located under Other Filings/Other Documents.(ckh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2082731.), filed by Linda Skye Waters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 SSA ID Form)(Parkinson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Linda Skye Waters
Represented By: Brad D Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?