Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Cindy Marie Wilson
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2020cv00387
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Marie Wilson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Parkinson, Brad)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. ((alw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Commissioner of Social Security, Cindy Marie Wilson re #1 Petition for Review,. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/27/2020. (alw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Cindy Marie Wilson This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2084563.), filed by Cindy Marie Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Statement of SSN)(Parkinson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cindy Marie Wilson
Represented By: Brad D Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?