Venemon v. Idaho State University Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Camille Venemon
Defendant: Idaho State University Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 4:2020cv00453
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Idaho State University Federal Credit Union. Idaho State University Federal Credit Union waiver sent on 10/27/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Duke, Keely)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process by Camille Venemon. (Ulrich, Amanda)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Idaho State University Federal Credit Union. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Idaho State University Federal Credit Union ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2106351.), filed by Camille Venemon. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ulrich, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venemon v. Idaho State University Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Venemon
Represented By: Ryan S. Dustin
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho State University Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?