McCallister v. Gould et al
Appellant: Kathleen A. McCallister
Appellee: Robert Daniel Everett Gould, Jr. and Brenda Jean Gould
Case Number: 4:2020cv00472
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings per docket 5: Appellant Brief due by 12/7/2020. (ckh)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: The record on appeal in this case having been received by the Clerk of the Court, and the Court being fully advised in the premises, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Appellant's opening brief shall be due on or before December 7, 2020. The response brief shall be due thirty (30) days from the date of receipt of the opening brief. Any reply brief shall be due fourteen (14) days after the date of receipt of appellees' response brief. Upon examination of the briefs and record on appeal, the court shall make a determination whether oral argument is needed pursuant to Rule 8019(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. The opening and response briefs shall not exceed 25 pages. The reply brief shall not exceed 15 pages. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (mls)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Designation of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Transcript 5/12/2020, #2 Transcript 8/4/2020, #3 Transcript 9/15/2020) (ckh)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Readiness (ckh)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Appeal (km)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-40182. File received (Notice sent to BK Judge and CA), filed by Kathleen A. McCallister. (Attachments: #1 BK Order Appealed, #2 Statement of Issues, #3 Appellee's Statement of Election, #4 Notice of Record on Appeal to BAP, #5 BAP Notice of Transfer of Appeal to District Court, #6 GO 349, #7 BK Docket Sheet) (km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCallister v. Gould et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kathleen A. McCallister
Represented By: Jeffrey Philip Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert Daniel Everett Gould, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brenda Jean Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?