Boondocker LLC v. Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.
Plaintiff: Boondocker LLC
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00517
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boondocker LLC (Herberholz, Dana)
December 15, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bombardier Recreational Products Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BRP Inc. for Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.. (Olson, Wendy)
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #11 Sealed Document Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Boondocker LLC. (Herberholz, Dana)
December 7, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bombardier Recreational Products Inc., Boondocker LLC re #7 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/5/2021. (alw)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Louis W Tompros for Bombardier Recreational Products Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 Sealed Document Re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit SEALED Declaration of Rocky Young Jr., #2 Exhibit SEALED Ex. Z to Young Declaration - Confidential Letter)(Herberholz, Dana)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Dana M Herberholz appearing for Plaintiff Boondocker LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit REDACTED Declaration of Rocky Young Jr., #2 Exhibit A - 'Polaris Acquires Klim Technical Riding Gear I Polaris EN-CA' - www_polaris_com, #3 Exhibit B - 'Arctic Cat Acquires Motorfist I Business Wire' - www_businesswire_com, #4 Exhibit C - 'Polaris Acquires Timbersled I Polaris' - www_polaris_com, #5 Exhibit D - 'Polaris Acquires 509 I Polaris' - www_polaris_com, #6 Exhibit E - 'Ski-Doo Launches World Premiere Technology With The All-New Summit 850 E-TEC Turbo Toronto Stock Exchange_DOO' - www_globenewswire_com, #7 Exhibit F - Registration Certificate, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Acknowledgement Under Section 15, #9 Exhibit H - Boondocker Screen, #10 Exhibit I - 'HC Sponsors I Jackson Hole Snow Devils' - snowdevils_org, #11 Exhibit J - SnoWest Pro Rider Highlights, #12 Exhibit K - 'Welcome to Team Polaris I Polaris Snowmobiles' - snowmobiles_polaris_com, #13 Exhibit L - Polaris Racing Banner, #14 Exhibit M - 'ROB ALFORD I Ski-Doo USA' - www_ski-doo_com, #15 Exhibit N - Ads in SnoWest, #16 Exhibit N - Part 2, #17 Exhibit N - Part 3, #18 Exhibit O - Part 1, #19 Exhibit O - Part 2, #20 Exhibit O - Part 3, #21 Exhibit P - November 2015 BD sled in ski-doo corporate booth, #22 Exhibit Q - BoonDocker RTR model snowmobile, #23 Exhibit R - FXR Ads, #24 Exhibit S - 2017 Klim Snow Catalog Cover, #25 Exhibit T - Klim Ads, #26 Exhibit U - Historical Race Results, #27 Exhibit V1 - 2016 Hillclimb Photographs, #28 Exhibit V2 - 2017 Hillclimb Photographs, #29 Exhibit V2 - Part 2, #30 Exhibit V3 - 2018 Hillclimb Photgraphs, #31 Exhibit V4 - 2019 Hillclimb Photographs, #32 Exhibit V4 - Part 2, #33 Exhibit V5 - 2015 X Games Photographs, #34 Exhibit W1 - 'How to Install a Boondocker Nitrous System I American Snowmobiler Magazine' - amsnow_com, #35 Exhibit W2 - 'BoonDocker Nitrous Oxide Kit Review I SnowGoer' - snowgoer_com, #36 Exhibit W3 - 'BoonDocker Launches New Turbocharger, Ushers In Next Era Of Technology I SnoWest Magazine' - www_snowest_com, #37 Exhibit W4 - 'BoonDocker Releases Turbo Kit for Ski-Doo E-Tec 800 R - MaxSled_com Snowmobile Magazine' - maxsled_com, #38 Exhibit W5 - 'BoonDocker releases Sidekick Pump Gas Arctic Cat Turbo Kit' - sleddermag_com, #39 Exhibit W6 - 'Electronic Tuning Updates I American Snowmobiler Magazine' - amsnow_com, #40 Exhibit W7 - '10 Takeaways From Boondockers I SnoWest Magazine' - www_snowest_com, #41 Exhibit W7 - Part 2, #42 Exhibit X - 'Boondocker, Tapio Racing' - www_snowest_com, #43 Exhibit Y - 2020-09 Mutual NDA for Confidential Meeting, #44 Affidavit Declaration of Dana M. Herberholz, #45 Exhibit A - BRP Application)(Herberholz, Dana)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Dana M Herberholz appearing for Plaintiff Boondocker LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Seal)(Herberholz, Dana)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Louis W. Tompros. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2136917.)Wendy Olson appearing for Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Olson, Wendy)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Olson on behalf of Bombardier Recreational Products Inc. (Olson, Wendy)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jonathan H Love for Boondocker LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jonathan H. Love. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2128498.)Dana M Herberholz appearing for Plaintiff Boondocker LLC. Responses due by 12/4/2020 (Herberholz, Dana)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)4340886 (Notice sent to USPTO) (alw)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boondocker LLC. (Herberholz, Dana)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Bombardier Recreational Products Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2126878.), filed by Boondocker LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Trademark Reg. No. 4,340,886 for BOONDOCKER, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Sheet)(Herberholz, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boondocker LLC v. Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boondocker LLC
Represented By: Jonathan H Love
Represented By: Dana M Herberholz
Represented By: Jordan Lee Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.
Represented By: Louis W Tompros
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?