Hyde-Rhodes v. Jefferson County
Plaintiff: Kim Hyde-Rhodes
Defendant: Jefferson County
Case Number: 4:2020cv00597
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Court Appointed Attorney or Representation (Application)by Plaintiff Kim Hyde-Rhodes. Responses due by 3/9/2021 (kt)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 Statement of Compliance by Kim Hyde-Rhodes Associated Cases: 4:20-cv-00600-BLW, 4:20-cv-00597-BLW, 4:20-cv-00598-BLW, 4:20-cv-00599-BLW(kt)
February 5, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY -Please disregard docket number #6 MOTION as it is a duplicate of dkt 5.(jp)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 DISREGARD: MOTION for Permission to Amend Complaints and Extension of Time to Do So by Plaintiff Kim Hyde-Rhodes. Responses due by 2/25/2021 (jp) See corrective entry.
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission to Amend Complaints and Extension of Time to do so #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 2/25/2021)by Plaintiff Kim Hyde-Rhodes. (alw)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kim Hyde-Rhodes. Responses due by 2/25/2021 (alw)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. If she desires to proceed, Plaintiff must take financial responsibility for her case, as explained above, within 14 days after entry of this Order. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint. Plaintiff may, inthe alternative, file a noitce of voluntary dismissal within 60 days after entry of this order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 5, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:20-cv-597-BLW (alw)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/31/2020) (jp).
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jefferson County, filed by Kim Hyde-Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyde-Rhodes v. Jefferson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Hyde-Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?