Newman v. Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Newman
Defendant: National Mortgage Resources, Inc. and Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020mc00056
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:157
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 JOINDER by Defendant National Mortgage Resources, Inc. joining #3 Reply to Response to Motion, That Moves District Court to Withdraw Reference, Because LLC Has a Right to Jury Trial. (Tucker, Brian)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Defendant newman 14 Long Beach LLC's reply to debtor newman's opposition to LLC motion that moves district court to withdraw reference, because LLC has a right to jury trial, POService filed by Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/12/2020.(March, Kathleen)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Steven Newman. Replies due by 3/19/2020.(Smith, Thomas)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Defendants Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC and National Mortgage Resources, Inc. Responses due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 National Mortgage Resources, Inc.'s Joinder in Motion to Withdraw Reference, #2 Adversary Proceeding Docket Sheet) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Mortgage Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T Tucker
Represented By: Nathan John Cuoio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newman 14 Long Beach, LLC
Represented By: Robert J Maynes
Represented By: Kathleen P March
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Newman
Represented By: Thomas Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?