Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation v. P4 Production, LLC
Plaintiff: Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation
Defendant: P4 Production LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00093
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. #4 ) is GRANTED. This case is hereby consolidated with United States v. P4 Production, L.L.C., Case No. 4:21-cv-00092-BLW. The Clerk is directed to consolidate 1:21-cv-00093-BLW with 4:21-cv-00092-BLW for all further proceedings. This action shall proceed under the lead case of 4:21-cv-00092-BLW, and all future pleadings shall be filed in that case. Case 1:21-cv-00093-BLW is closed. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:21-cv-00092-BLW, 4:21-cv-00093-BLW(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation. P4 Production LLC waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Grant, Jill)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for P4 Production LLC and counsel for Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation re #1 Complaint and #7 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/3/2021. (jd)
March 4, 2021 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William Gerry Myers, III on behalf of P4 Production LLC (Myers, William)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jill Elise Grant for Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Please use case number 4:21-cv-00093-BLW for all future filings. (jd)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases William F Bacon appearing for Plaintiff Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation. Responses due by 3/24/2021 (Bacon, William)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jill Elise Grant. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2175417.)William F Bacon appearing for Plaintiff Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation. Responses due by 3/22/2021 (Bacon, William)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Bacon, William)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against P4 Production LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0976-2175400.), filed by Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation.(Bacon, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation v. P4 Production, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoshone-Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation
Represented By: William F Bacon
Represented By: Jill Elise Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P4 Production LLC
Represented By: Kevin Reid Murray
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?