Wheatley v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kristi R. Wheatley
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Incorporated, William Cook Europe APS and Cook Medical Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2021cv00163
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clerk of Court of electronically transferring case per 6 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-141) re MDL 2570 to the Southern District of Indiana. (kt)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Southern District of Indiana. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 141) MDL 2570 (Attachments: #1 Minute Order, #2 CTO Finalized)(kt)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristi R. Wheatley. William Cook Europe APS served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Larsen, Wes)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristi R. Wheatley. Cook Medical, LLC served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Larsen, Wes)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristi R. Wheatley. Cook Incorporated served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Larsen, Wes)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(kt)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe APS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2198676.), filed by Kristi R. Wheatley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Larsen, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheatley v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi R. Wheatley
Represented By: Wes S Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?