Jackman v. City of Pocatello et al
Plaintiff: Michael A. Jackman
Defendant: City of Pocatello, Roger Schei, Kevin Nielsen and John Does I-X
Case Number: 4:2021cv00379
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/23/2021 10:00 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 1/6/2022 10:00 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale. All parties shall use the Court's Zoom teleconferencing line to connect to this hearing, by dialing: 1-669-254-5252, Meeting ID: 161 5442 0149, Passcode: 787003. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 12/30/2021. (at)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCETelephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2021 10:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before November 16, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Pocatello, Kevin Nielsen, Roger Schei. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)
September 22, 2021 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge Candy W Dale. Please use case number 4:21-cv-379-CWD for all future filings. (alw)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2275123.), filed by Michael A. Jackman. (Attachments: #1 Summons City of Pocatello, #2 Summons Roger Schei, #3 Summons Kevin Nielsen, #4 Cover Sheet)(Wood, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackman v. City of Pocatello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Jackman
Represented By: T Jason Wood
Represented By: Jason Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pocatello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Schei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?