Polatis v. Katseanes et al
Plaintiff: Christian Polatis
Defendant: Brock Katseanes, Jared Miller, Todd Howell, Brianna Daniels, Craig Rowland, Bingham County and John Does I - X
Case Number: 4:2021cv00392
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Polatis. Brianna Daniels served on 11/14/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Wood, Jason)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Polatis. Todd Howell served on 11/13/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Wood, Jason)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Polatis. Brock Katseanes served on 11/13/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Wood, Jason)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Polatis. Bingham County served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Wood, Jason)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christian Polatis.(Wood, Jason)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Set Bond (Dkt. 2) is GRANTED. The Court conditionally sets the amount of the required bond at $500, subject to Defendants' right to except to that amount as set forth in I.C. 6-610(4). If such an exception is filed, the Court will then consider whether the bond amount should be increased. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Bond Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiff Christian Polatis. Responses due by 10/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wood, Jason)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Christian Polatis was filed incorrectly in this case. This document will be considered the 'Proposed Complaint' to #2 Motion for Bond. You will be advised to re-file the Complaint on order by the Court. For future reference, the event that should have been used to file #2 Motion for Bond is *** Motion to Waive ***. (kt) Modified on 9/29/2021 to correct parties and include additional information (kt).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The initial Corrective Entry was filed incorrectly in this case. Please disregard.(kt)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2279682.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Bingham County, #3 Summons - Howell, #4 Summons - Miller, #5 Summons - Rowland, #6 Summons - Katseanes, #7 Summons - Daniels)(Wood, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polatis v. Katseanes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Polatis
Represented By: Jason Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Katseanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brianna Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bingham County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I - X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?