Frontier Credit Union v. Serr, et al.
Plaintiff: Frontier Credit Union and formerly East Idaho Credit Union, an Idaho state-chartered credit union
Defendant: Adam C. Serr, Sr., Shayla Lynn Kelley, Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Doe Business Entities 1-10, John/Jane Does 11-20 and Shayla Lynn Hawkins
Case Number: 4:2023cv00433
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Amanda K Brailsford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC re. dkt #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/22/2024. (ac)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay The Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Shayla Lynn Kelley, Adam C. Serr, Sr.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/16/2023.(McLaughlin, Alexander)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Stay The Proceedings and Compel Arbitration or Alternatively to Dismiss filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC.(Evans, Jon)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan D Goodin on behalf of Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Shayla Lynn Kelley, Adam C. Serr, Sr (Goodin, Morgan)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay The Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by Frontier Credit Union. Replies due by 11/15/2023.(Cooper, Gary)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:The Stipulation (Dkt. #9 ) is APPROVED; and This action and Frontier Credit Union v. Adam C. Serr, Sr., et al., Case No. 4:23-cv-00434-AKB, are hereby consolidated for all purposes, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). All further pleadings or filings shall be submitted only in Case No. 4:23-cv-00433-AKB, which is now the lead case. The parties will use the case caption as it currently exists in this action. The Clerk of the Court shall place a signed copy of this Order in the file of this action and in Case No. 4:23-cv-00434-AKB. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases by Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Shayla Lynn Kelley, Adam C. Serr, Sr. (McLaughlin, Alexander)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Shayla Lynn Kelley, Adam C. Serr, Sr. (McLaughlin, Alexander)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Stay The Proceedings and Compel Arbitration Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Defendants Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Shayla Lynn Kelley, Adam C. Serr, Sr. Responses due by 11/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(McLaughlin, Alexander)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Frontier Credit Union, Shayla Lynn Kelley, Adam C. Serr, Sr re. dkt #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/4/2023. (ac)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ac)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt. #2 , dkt. #3 and dkt. #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney's Michael S. Taaffe, Michael V. Colvin and Brandon M. Taaffe for Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Shayla Lynn Kelley,and Adam C. Serr, Sr. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC served on 10/4/2023; Kristin L. Bergeson served on 10/4/2023; Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC served on 10/4/2023; Shayla Lynn Kelley served on 10/4/2023; Adam C. Serr, Sr served on 10/4/2023. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ac)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brandon M. Taaffe. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2639413.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Defendants Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Shayla Lynn Kelley, Adam C. Serr, Sr. Responses due by 10/25/2023 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michael V. Colvin. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2639409.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Defendants Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Shayla Lynn Kelley, Adam C. Serr, Sr. Responses due by 10/25/2023 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michael S. Taaffe. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2639401.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Defendants Kristin L. Bergeson, Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Shayla Lynn Kelley, Adam C. Serr, Sr. Responses due by 10/25/2023 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Adam C. Serr, Sr, Kristin L. Bergeson, Shayla Lynn Kelley from Seventh Judicial District Court, Bonneville County, case number CV10-23-4384.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2639274.), filed by Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, Adam C. Serr, Sr, Kristin L. Bergeson, Shayla Lynn Kelley. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Verified Complaint, Reservation of Right to Seek Punitive Damages, and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons - Adam C. Serr, Sr., #3 Summons - Shayla Lynn Kelley, #4 Summons - Kristin L. Bergeson, #5 Summons - Bright Star Financial Advisors, #6 Summons - Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, #7 Affidavit of Service - Adam C. Serr, Sr., #8 Affidavit of Service - Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, #9 Affidavit of Service - Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC, #10 Affidavit of Service - Kristin Bergeson, #11 Affidavit of Service - Shayla Lynn Kelley, #12 Register of Actions, #13 Cover Sheet)(McLaughlin, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frontier Credit Union v. Serr, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frontier Credit Union
Represented By: Gary Lee Cooper
Represented By: Ron Kerl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: formerly East Idaho Credit Union, an Idaho state-chartered credit union
Represented By: Gary Lee Cooper
Represented By: Ron Kerl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam C. Serr, Sr.
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Robert Blaine White
Represented By: Brandon M. Taaffe
Represented By: Michael V. Colvin
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Morgan D Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shayla Lynn Kelley
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Robert Blaine White
Represented By: Brandon M. Taaffe
Represented By: Michael V. Colvin
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Morgan D Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin L. Bergeson
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Robert Blaine White
Represented By: Michael V. Colvin
Represented By: Brandon M. Taaffe
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Morgan D Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Star Financial Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Robert Blaine White
Represented By: Brandon M. Taaffe
Represented By: Michael V. Colvin
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Morgan D Goodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Ed Magarian
Represented By: Jon Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Business Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shayla Lynn Hawkins
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Brandon M. Taaffe
Represented By: Michael V. Colvin
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Morgan D Goodin
Represented By: Robert Blaine White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?