Clean Energy Renewables, LLC
Debtor: Clean Energy Renewables, LLC
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Trustee: Robert E Eggmann
Case Number: 1:2022bk80432
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Perkins
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Filing 114 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#109 Order on Application for Compensation) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/15/2022. (Admin.)
September 14, 2022 Filing 113 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#107 Order on Motion for Continuation of Utility Service) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/14/2022. (Admin.)
September 14, 2022 Filing 112 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#108 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 63. Notice Date 09/14/2022. (Admin.)
September 14, 2022 Filing 111 Interim Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing). (court, ckey)
September 14, 2022 Filing 110 Agreed Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc #71) (court, ckey)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc #88) for Rafool & Bourne P.C., fees awarded: $14130.00, expenses awarded: $32.00 (court, ckey)
September 12, 2022 Filing 108 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#103 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, #104 Application for Administrative Expenses filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing to be held on 10/11/2022 at 10:30 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #103 and for #104, (court, ckey)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order Granting Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) (Related Doc #64) (court, ckey)
September 10, 2022 Filing 106 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#102 Notice of Amendment) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/10/2022. (Admin.)
September 10, 2022 Filing 105 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#102 Notice of Amendment) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/10/2022. (Admin.)
September 9, 2022 Filing 104 Application for Administrative Expenses and authority for immediate payment. Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Open Accounts with NRG) (Bourne, Sumner)
September 9, 2022 Filing 103 Application to Employ Marsha Tilton Jones CPA as Accountant nunc pro tunc Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Employment Affidavit) (Bourne, Sumner)
September 8, 2022 Filing 102 Notice of Amendment (RE: related document(s)#100 Summary of Assets and Liabilities filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, Amended Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J or Modify Creditor Addresses), Amended Schedules (Fee) (Schedules D,E/F - new creditors or modified debt amounts), Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury) (court, ckey)
September 7, 2022 Filing 101 Certificate of Service Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (RE: related document(s)#100 Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Amended Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J or Modify Creditor Addresses), Amended Schedules (Fee) (Schedules D,E/F - new creditors or modified debt amounts), Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury). (Bourne, Sumner)
September 7, 2022 Filing 100 Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual, Amended Schedules Schedule A/B, , Amended Schedules Schedule E/F Fee Amount $32, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
September 7, 2022 Filing 99 (Text-only order, no associated pdf) IT IS ORDERED: Amended Schedule of Salary is Approved. (RE: related document(s)#65 Schedule of Salary filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC). (court, ckey)
September 7, 2022 Filing 98 Court Notice Requesting Order (RE: related document(s)#64 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Order Due 9/21/2022. (court, ckey)
September 7, 2022 Receipt of Amended Schedules (Fee) (Schedules D,E/F - new creditors or modified debt amounts)(# 22-80432) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13137149. Fee amount 32.00 (re: Doc#100) (U.S. Treasury)
September 6, 2022 Filing 97 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/6/2022 10:30:50 AM ]. File Size [ 101740 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:42:24 ]. (Attorney: Sumner Bourne). (admin).
September 6, 2022 Filing 96 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#71 Motion for Relief From Stay (Fee) filed by Creditor North Mill Capital, LLC) Hearing held deadline set (Agreed Order): 9/20/2022. (court, jter)
September 6, 2022 Filing 95 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#66 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing held deadline set (Amended Application - See Pro Memo): 9/20/2022. (court, jter)
September 6, 2022 Filing 94 Oral Notice of Hearing - Call In; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing to be held on 11/8/2022 at 11:00 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #6, (court, jter)
September 6, 2022 Filing 93 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing held deadline set (Interim Order): 9/20/2022. (court, jter)
September 6, 2022 Filing 92 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) (court, jter)
September 1, 2022 Filing 91 Objection to(related document(s): #6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral /Preliminary Determination of Potential Asserted Cash Collateral Liens or Alternatively Adequate Protection filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing ) Filed by Allison Yager of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP on behalf of BizFund, LLC (Yager, Allison)
August 27, 2022 Filing 90 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#89 Notice Scheduling Objection Date) No. of Notices: 58. Notice Date 08/27/2022. (Admin.)
August 25, 2022 Filing 89 Notice Scheduling Objections (RE: related document(s)#88 Application for Compensation filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Objections Due: 9/11/2022. (court, mhei)
August 24, 2022 Filing 88 First Application for Compensation for Rafool & Bourne P.C., Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $14,130.00, Expenses: $32.00. Filed by Clean Energy Renewables, LLC Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Time and Cost Records) (Bourne, Sumner)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc #51) (court, ckey)
August 23, 2022 Filing 86 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Peter A Siddiqui of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP on behalf of BizFund, LLC. (Siddiqui, Peter)
August 23, 2022 Filing 85 Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 23, 2022 Filing 84 Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2022 Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule Bank Account Statement (1) #2 Supplement Bank Account Statement (2) #3 Supplement Bank Account Statement (3)) (Bourne, Sumner)
August 23, 2022 Filing 83 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Allison Yager of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP on behalf of BizFund, LLC. (Yager, Allison)
August 22, 2022 Filing 82 Notice of Change of Address for J. Basil Mattingly, P.O. Box 790, Maysville, KY 41056-0790. New address changed to: J. Basil Mattingly, P.O. Box 792, Maysville, KY 41056 Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 21, 2022 Filing 81 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#79 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/21/2022. (Admin.)
August 20, 2022 Filing 80 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#73 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 08/20/2022. (Admin.)
August 19, 2022 Filing 79 Agreed Order (RE: related document(s)#22 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC). (court, lspi)
August 19, 2022 Filing 78 Court Notice Requesting Order (RE: related document(s)#51 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Order Due 9/2/2022. (court, lspi)
August 18, 2022 Filing 77 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#68 Notice Scheduling Objection Date) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 08/18/2022. (Admin.)
August 18, 2022 Filing 76 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#69 Salary Schedule Objection Notice) No. of Notices: 58. Notice Date 08/18/2022. (Admin.)
August 18, 2022 Filing 75 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#72 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 57. Notice Date 08/18/2022. (Admin.)
August 18, 2022 Filing 74 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#70 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 58. Notice Date 08/18/2022. (Admin.)
August 18, 2022 Filing 73 Interim Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing). (court, ckey)
August 17, 2022 Meeting of Creditors Held as Scheduled (RE: related document(s)#14 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/17/2022 at 02:00 PM at Telephonically with Chapter 11 Trustee (Conference Line: 1-877-988-4958, Participant Code: 7219234). Proofs of Claims due by 9/26/2022. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts: 10/16/2022.). (Petesch, Sabrina)
August 16, 2022 Filing 72 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#71 Motion for Relief From Stay (Fee) filed by Creditor North Mill Capital, LLC) Prelim. Hearing to be held on 9/6/2022 at 10:30 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #71, (court, ckey)
August 16, 2022 Filing 71 Motion for Relief from Stay (Fee) Filed by Mark A Ludolph of Heyl, Royster, Voelker & Allen on behalf of North Mill Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit G #7 Exhibit H #8 Exhibit F-1 #9 Exhibit F-2) (Ludolph, Mark)
August 16, 2022 Filing 70 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#66 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing to be held on 9/6/2022 at 10:30 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #66, (court, ckey)
August 16, 2022 Filing 69 Notice Scheduling Objections (RE: related document(s)#65 Schedule of Salary filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Objections Due: 9/2/2022. (court, ckey)
August 16, 2022 Filing 68 Notice Scheduling Objections (RE: related document(s)#64 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Objections Due: 9/2/2022. (court, ckey)
August 16, 2022 Filing 67 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#22 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credi t Company LLC) Hearing held deadline (Agreed Order Due) set: 8/30/2022. (court, ckey)
August 16, 2022 Filing 66 Application to Employ Raymond P. Fitzpatrick Jr. as Special Counsel Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Employment/Interest) (Bourne, Sumner)
August 16, 2022 Filing 65 Schedule of Salary Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 16, 2022 Filing 64 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) as to MidAmerican Energy, Mediacom Business and Verizon Wireless Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (Bourne, Sumner)
August 16, 2022 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay (Fee)(# 22-80432) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13111474. Fee amount 188.00 (re: Doc#71) (U.S. Treasury)
August 5, 2022 Filing 63 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#55 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/05/2022. (Admin.)
August 3, 2022 Filing 62 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#50 Salary Schedule Objection Notice) No. of Notices: 55. Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.)
August 3, 2022 Filing 61 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#49 Generate PDF Notice to BNC) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.)
August 3, 2022 Filing 60 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#52 Employment of Professional Objection Date Notice) No. of Notices: 55. Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.)
August 3, 2022 Filing 59 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#48 Post Petition Creditor Notice) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.)
August 3, 2022 Filing 58 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/3/2022 1:30:44 PM ]. File Size [ 85073 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:35:27 ]. (Attorney: Sumner Bourne). (admin).
August 3, 2022 Filing 57 Oral Notice of Continued Hearing - Call In; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing to be held on 9/6/2022 at 10:30 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #6, (court, ckey)
August 3, 2022 Filing 56 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing held deadline (Interim Order Due) set: 8/17/2022. (court, ckey)
August 3, 2022 Filing 55 Agreed Interim Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing). (court, ckey)
August 2, 2022 Filing 54 Withdrawal of Claim Nos. 8 (Office Machine Consultants, Inc.) (webclaimusr)
August 1, 2022 Filing 53 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Shanna M. Kaminski of Kaminski Law, PLLC on behalf of Fox Capital Group, Inc.. (Kaminski, Shanna)
August 1, 2022 Filing 52 Notice Scheduling Objections re Employment of Professional (RE: related document(s)#51 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Objections Due: 8/18/2022. (court, ckey)
August 1, 2022 Filing 51 Application to Employ Sumner A. Bourne as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Employment) (Bourne, Sumner)
August 1, 2022 Filing 50 Notice Scheduling Objections (RE: related document(s)#47 Schedule of Salary filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Objections Due: 8/18/2022. (court, ckey)
August 1, 2022 Filing 49 Generate PDF Notice to BNC (court, ckey)
August 1, 2022 Filing 48 Notice to Post Petition Creditors. (court, ckey)
August 1, 2022 Filing 47 Schedule of Salary Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 1, 2022 Filing 46 Amendment to List of Creditors (Fee) Fee Amount $32 Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 1, 2022 Filing 45 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 1, 2022 Filing 44 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 1, 2022 Filing 43 Schedule of Income and Expenditures (non-individuals) Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 1, 2022 Filing 42 Schedule A/B Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 1, 2022 Filing 41 Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 1, 2022 Filing 40 Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
August 1, 2022 Receipt of Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)(# 22-80432) [misc,amdcm] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13090575. Fee amount 32.00 (re: Doc#46) (U.S. Treasury)
July 31, 2022 Filing 39 Notice of Change of Address for Matthew Cumberworth, Sr., 3223 12th Avenue, Peoria, IL 61625-0001. New address changed to: Matthew Cumberworth, Sr., 3223 12th Avenue, Moline, IL 61265 Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
July 29, 2022 Filing 38 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#36 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 07/29/2022. (Admin.)
July 29, 2022 Filing 37 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#35 Order on Motion to Pay) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/29/2022. (Admin.)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing). (court, ckey)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting Motion To Pay (Related Doc #8) (court, ckey)
July 26, 2022 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Paul A Osborn of Ward, Murray, Pace & Johnson, P.C. on behalf of BankORION. (Osborn, Paul)
July 26, 2022 Filing 33 Creditor Request for Notices Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Rawal, Arvind)
July 24, 2022 Filing 32 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#27 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/24/2022. (Admin.)
July 22, 2022 Filing 31 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#18 Order Setting Hearing) No. of Notices: 49. Notice Date 07/22/2022. (Admin.)
July 22, 2022 Filing 30 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/22/2022 10:00:45 AM ]. File Size [ 240318 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:40:08 ]. (Attorney: Sumner Bourne). (admin).
July 22, 2022 Filing 29 Oral Notice of Continued Hearing - Call In; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing to be held on 8/3/2022 at 01:30 PM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #6, (court, lspi)
July 22, 2022 Filing 28 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, #7 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, #8 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing held deadline set (Orders) due: 8/5/2022. (court, lspi)
July 22, 2022 Filing 27 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#22 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC) Hearing to be held on 8/16/2022 at 10:00 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #22, (court, lspi)
July 21, 2022 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#11 Order Requiring Missing Documents) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2022. (Admin.)
July 21, 2022 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#10 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 46. Notice Date 07/21/2022. (Admin.)
July 21, 2022 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#14 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12) No. of Notices: 49. Notice Date 07/21/2022. (Admin.)
July 21, 2022 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#12 Order and Deficiency Notice for Chapter 11/12 Cases) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2022. (Admin.)
July 21, 2022 Filing 22 Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Steven L Nelson on behalf of Ford Motor Credi t Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Contract & Title #2 Contract & Title #3 Contract & Title #4 Contract & Title #5 Contract & Title) (Nelson, Steven)
July 20, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Mark A Ludolph of Heyl, Royster, Voelker & Allen on behalf of North Mill Capital, LLC. (Ludolph, Mark)
July 20, 2022 Filing 20 Certificate of Service (Second Supplemental) Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (RE: related document(s)#10 Call In Telephonic - BK). (Bourne, Sumner)
July 20, 2022 Filing 19 Certificate of Service (Supplemental) Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (RE: related document(s)#10 Call In Telephonic - BK). (Bourne, Sumner)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Setting Chapter 11 Subchapter V Status Conference Hearing; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC). Hearing to be held on 9/6/2022 at 10:30 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #1, Pre-Status Report Due By 8/23/2022. (court, lspi)
July 20, 2022 Filing 17 Ch 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Verified Statement and Acceptance of Appointment. (Eggmann, Robert)
July 20, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Steven L Nelson on behalf of Ford Motor Credi t Company LLC. (Nelson, Steven)
July 19, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Service Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (RE: related document(s)#10 Call In Telephonic - BK). (Bourne, Sumner)
July 19, 2022 Filing 14 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/17/2022 at 02:00 PM at Telephonically with Chapter 11 Trustee (Conference Line: 1-877-988-4958, Participant Code: 7219234). Proofs of Claims due by 9/26/2022. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts: 10/16/2022. (court, lspi)
July 19, 2022 Filing 13 Correspondence Filed by Sabrina M Petesch on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Petesch, Sabrina)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order and Deficiency Notice for Chapter 11/12 Cases (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC). Deficiency Due 8/2/2022. (court, lspi)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Requiring Missing Documents . Missing Documents Due by 8/1/2022. (court, lspi)
July 19, 2022 Filing 10 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, #7 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC, #8 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor Clean Energy Renewables, LLC) Hearing to be held on 7/22/2022 at 10:00 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #7 and for #8 and for #6, (court, lspi)
July 19, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appointment of Trustee Robert E Eggmann. Robert E Eggmann added to the case. (U.S. Trustee)
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 Motion to Pay Employee Wages and Benefits in the ordinary course of business, Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (Bourne, Sumner)
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay /Enforce Automatic Stay as to Specified Creditors, Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (Bourne, Sumner)
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral /Preliminary Determination of Potential Asserted Cash Collateral Liens or Alternatively Adequate Protection, Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Six Month Projection of Cash Flow) (Bourne, Sumner)
July 18, 2022 Filing 5 Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
July 18, 2022 Filing 4 Balance Sheet Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 Small Business Federal Income Tax Return Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 Small Business Cash Flow Statement Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Clean Energy Renewables, LLC Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 10/16/2022. (Bourne, Sumner)
July 18, 2022 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-80432) [misc,volp11cc] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13073945. Fee amount 1738.00 (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Clean Energy Renewables, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Clean Energy Renewables, LLC
Represented By: Sumner A. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Sabrina M Petesch
Represented By: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Robert E Eggmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?