Bass Street Moline, LLC
Debtor: Bass Street Moline, LLC
Trustee: Steven Wallace
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 1:2022bk80459
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Perkins
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Filing 97 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#84 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing held deadline set (Order) : 10/3/2022. (court, jter)
September 19, 2022 Filing 96 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#45 Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee) filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing held deadline set (Correct Amended Schedules E/F) : 10/3/2022. (court, jter)
September 19, 2022 Filing 95 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) (court, jter)
September 14, 2022 Filing 94 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#92 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/14/2022. (Admin.)
September 13, 2022 Filing 93 Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
September 12, 2022 Filing 92 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#91 Motion to Allow Claims filed by Creditor Performance Food Group, Inc.) Hearing to be held on 9/29/2022 at 10:30 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #91, (court, jter)
September 12, 2022 Filing 91 Motion to Allow Claims and Payment of Administrative Expenses Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 503(b)(9) Filed by James S Zmuda on behalf of Performance Food Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Zmuda, James)
September 11, 2022 Filing 90 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#85 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/11/2022. (Admin.)
September 10, 2022 Filing 89 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#83 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 36. Notice Date 09/10/2022. (Admin.)
September 9, 2022 Filing 88 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#81 Salary Schedule Objection Notice) No. of Notices: 36. Notice Date 09/09/2022. (Admin.)
September 9, 2022 Filing 87 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#78 7 Day Notice Order) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/09/2022. (Admin.)
September 9, 2022 Filing 86 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James S Zmuda on behalf of Performance Food Group, Inc.. (Zmuda, James)
September 9, 2022 Filing 85 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#84 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing to be held on 9/19/2022 at 10:00 AM for #84, (court, jter)
September 8, 2022 Filing 84 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (Haake, Dale)
September 8, 2022 Filing 83 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#82 Motion for Approval or Authority filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing to be held on 9/29/2022 at 10:30 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #82, (court, lspi)
September 8, 2022 Filing 82 Motion for Approval of or Authority to Ratify Payment to Pre-Petition Vendor Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (Haake, Dale)
September 7, 2022 Filing 81 Notice Scheduling Objections (RE: related document(s)#79 Amended Schedule of Salary filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Objections Due: 9/24/2022. (court, jter)
September 7, 2022 Filing 80 DISREGARD THIS ENTRY - FORM NOT PRODUCED. Notice Scheduling Objections (RE: related document(s)#79 Amended Schedule of Salary filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Objections Due: 9/24/2022. (court, jter) Modified on 9/7/2022 (court, jter).
September 7, 2022 Filing 79 Schedule of Salary Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
September 7, 2022 Filing 78 7 Day Notice Order . Required Document (Pre-Status Conference Report) to be filed by 9/14/2022. (court, jter)
September 7, 2022 Corrective Entry (RE: related document(s) 80 Notice Scheduling Objection Date)- DISREGARD THIS ENTRY - FORM NOT PRODUCED (court, jter)
September 1, 2022 Meeting of Creditors Held as Scheduled (RE: related document(s)#12 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/1/2022 at 09:00 AM at Telephonically with Chapter 11 Trustee (Conference Line: 1-877-988-4958, Participant Code: 7219234). Proofs of Claims due by 10/7/2022. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts: 10/31/2022.). (Petesch, Sabrina)
August 31, 2022 Filing 77 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#76 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/31/2022. (Admin.)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#17 Schedule of Salary filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC). (court, jter)
August 28, 2022 Filing 75 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#70 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/28/2022. (Admin.)
August 27, 2022 Filing 74 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#67 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/27/2022. (Admin.)
August 27, 2022 Filing 73 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#66 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/27/2022. (Admin.)
August 27, 2022 Filing 72 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#65 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/27/2022. (Admin.)
August 27, 2022 Filing 71 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#68 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/27/2022. (Admin.)
August 26, 2022 Filing 70 Agreed Order Re: Fox Capital Group INC (RE: related document(s)#34 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC, #40 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC). (court, jter)
August 25, 2022 Filing 69 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#63 Order on Application to Employ Professional) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/25/2022. (Admin.)
August 25, 2022 Filing 68 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#45 Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee) filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing to be held on 9/19/2022 at 10:00 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #45, (court, jter)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order Re: Shift4, LLC (RE: related document(s)#34 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC, #40 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC). (court, mhei)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order Re: Funding Metrics, LLC d/b/a Lendini (RE: related document(s)#34 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC, #40 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC). (court, mhei)
August 25, 2022 Filing 65 Agreed Order Re: BizFund LLC (RE: related document(s)#34 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC, #40 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC). (court, mhei)
August 23, 2022 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Peter A Siddiqui of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP on behalf of BizFund, LLC. (Siddiqui, Peter)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc #14) (court, jter)
August 23, 2022 Filing 62 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Allison Yager of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP on behalf of BizFund, LLC. (Yager, Allison)
August 23, 2022 Filing 61 Court Notice Requesting Order (RE: related document(s)#17 Schedule of Salary filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Order Due 9/6/2022. (court, jter)
August 22, 2022 Filing 60 Court Notice Requesting Order (RE: related document(s)#14 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Order Due 9/5/2022. (court, jter)
August 21, 2022 Filing 59 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#55 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/21/2022. (Admin.)
August 21, 2022 Filing 58 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#56 Generic Deficiency Notice) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/21/2022. (Admin.)
August 20, 2022 Filing 57 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#47 Amendment Deficiency Notice) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/20/2022. (Admin.)
August 19, 2022 Filing 56 AMENDED Deficiency Notice Re: Amended Schedule E/F. (RE: related document(s)#45 Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee) filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC, #47 Amendment Deficiency Notice) Deficiency Due 8/24/2022. (court, mhei)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order Extending Deadline to File (RE: related document(s)#49 Statement of Operations filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC, #50 Small Business Cash Flow Statement filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC, #51 Schedule of Income and Expenditures filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC). Documents Due by 9/12/2022 (court, mhei)
August 18, 2022 Filing 54 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#35 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/18/2022. (Admin.)
August 18, 2022 Filing 53 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#36 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/18/2022. (Admin.)
August 18, 2022 Filing 52 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#37 Notice) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/18/2022. (Admin.)
August 18, 2022 Filing 51 Schedule of Income and Expenditures (non-individuals) Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
August 18, 2022 Filing 50 Small Business Cash Flow Statement Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
August 18, 2022 Filing 49 Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
August 18, 2022 Filing 48 Balance Sheet Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
August 18, 2022 Filing 47 Amendment Deficiency Notice (RE: related document(s)#45 Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee) filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Amendment Deficiency Due 9/1/2022. (court, ckey)
August 18, 2022 Filing 46 Small Business Federal Income Tax Return Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
August 18, 2022 Filing 45 Amendment to List of Creditors (Fee) Fee Amount $32 Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
August 18, 2022 Filing 44 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual - Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule G: Non-Individual - Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual - Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
August 18, 2022 Filing 43 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/18/2022 10:00:49 AM ]. File Size [ 91892 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:38:17 ]. (Attorney: Dale Haake). (admin).
August 18, 2022 Filing 42 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#34 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing held deadline set (4 ORDERS: 2 Agreed Orders & 2 Not Agreed Orders): 8/25/2022. (court, jter)
August 18, 2022 Receipt of Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)(# 22-80459) [misc,amdcm] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13114995. Fee amount 32.00 (re: Doc#45) (U.S. Treasury)
August 17, 2022 Filing 41 Certificate of Service Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (RE: related document(s)#40 Supplemental Motion to Impose Automatic Stay ). (Haake, Dale)
August 17, 2022 Filing 40 Supplemental Motion to Impose Automatic Stay Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (Haake, Dale)
August 16, 2022 Filing 39 Creditor Request for Notices Filed by Creditor Funding Metrics LLC. (Giuliano, Anthony)
August 16, 2022 Filing 38 Certificate of Service Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (RE: related document(s)#34 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay , #36 Call In Telephonic - BK). (Haake, Dale)
August 16, 2022 Filing 37 Notice Re: Service of Hearing Notice by Debtor's Attorney. (RE: related document(s)#36 Call In Telephonic - BK) Certificate of Service Due: 8/16/2022. (court, jter)
August 16, 2022 Filing 36 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#34 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing to be held on 8/18/2022 at 10:00 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #34, (court, jter)
August 16, 2022 Filing 35 Agreed Interim Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#21 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC). (court, jter)
August 15, 2022 Filing 34 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (Haake, Dale)
August 13, 2022 Filing 33 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#32 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/13/2022. (Admin.)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time (Related Doc #31) (court, lspi)
August 10, 2022 Filing 31 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time to file Required Documents, Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (Haake, Dale)
August 9, 2022 Filing 30 Oral Notice of Hearing - Call In; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#21 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing to be held on 9/29/2022 at 10:30 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #21, (court, jter)
August 9, 2022 Filing 29 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#21 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing held deadline set (Interim Order) : 8/23/2022. (court, jter)
August 9, 2022 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Douglas Lindstrom on behalf of Moline Hotel, LLC. (Lindstrom, Douglas)
August 8, 2022 Filing 27 Certificate of Service Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (RE: related document(s)#23 Call In Telephonic - BK). (Haake, Dale)
August 7, 2022 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#23 Call In Telephonic - BK) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/07/2022. (Admin.)
August 5, 2022 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#18 Salary Schedule Objection Notice) No. of Notices: 29. Notice Date 08/05/2022. (Admin.)
August 5, 2022 Filing 24 Notice Re: Service of Hearing Notice by Debtor's Attorney (RE: related document(s)#23 Call In Telephonic - BK) Certificate of Service Due: 8/5/2022. (court, mhei)
August 5, 2022 Filing 23 Call In Telephonic; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#21 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Hearing to be held on 8/9/2022 at 01:30 PM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #21, (court, mhei)
August 4, 2022 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#15 Employment of Professional Objection Date Notice) No. of Notices: 29. Notice Date 08/04/2022. (Admin.)
August 4, 2022 Filing 21 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (Haake, Dale)
August 3, 2022 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#9 Order Setting Hearing) No. of Notices: 29. Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.)
August 3, 2022 Filing 19 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#12 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12) No. of Notices: 33. Notice Date 08/03/2022. (Admin.)
August 3, 2022 Filing 18 Notice Scheduling Objections (RE: related document(s)#17 Schedule of Salary filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Objections Due: 8/20/2022. (court, jter)
August 3, 2022 Filing 17 Schedule of Salary Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC. (Haake, Dale)
August 3, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Paul A Osborn of Ward, Murray, Pace & Johnson, P.C. on behalf of BankORION. (Osborn, Paul)
August 2, 2022 Filing 15 Notice Scheduling Objections re Employment of Professional (RE: related document(s)#14 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC) Objections Due: 8/19/2022. (court, jter)
August 2, 2022 Filing 14 Application to Employ Dale G. Haake as Attorney Filed by Dale G Haake on behalf of Bass Street Moline, LLC (Haake, Dale)
August 1, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Shanna M. Kaminski of Kaminski Law, PLLC on behalf of Fox Capital Group, Inc.. (Kaminski, Shanna)
August 1, 2022 Filing 12 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/1/2022 at 09:00 AM at Telephonically with Chapter 11 Trustee (Conference Line: 1-877-988-4958, Participant Code: 7219234). Proofs of Claims due by 10/7/2022. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts: 10/31/2022. (court, lspi)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 Correspondence Filed by Sabrina M Petesch on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Petesch, Sabrina)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Steven M. Wallace of Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.C. on behalf of Steven Wallace. (Wallace, Steven)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Chapter 11 Subchapter V Status Conference Hearing; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1831 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 1082031. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC). Hearing to be held on 9/19/2022 at 10:00 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for #1, Pre-Status Report Due By 9/5/2022. (court, jter)
July 31, 2022 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#5 Order Requiring Missing Documents) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/31/2022. (Admin.)
July 31, 2022 Filing 7 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#6 Order and Deficiency Notice for Chapter 11/12 Cases) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/31/2022. (Admin.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Deficiency Notice for Chapter 11/12 Cases (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Bass Street Moline, LLC). Deficiency Due 8/12/2022. (court, lspi)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Missing Documents . Missing Documents Due by 8/12/2022. (court, lspi)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 Ch 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Verified Statement and Acceptance of Appointment. (Wallace, Steven)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appointment of Trustee Steven Wallace. Steven Wallace added to the case. (Wiley, Jamie)
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Clean Energy Renewables, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Bass Street Moline, LLC Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 10/27/2022. (Haake, Dale)
July 29, 2022 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-80459) [misc,volp11cc] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13088936. Fee amount 1738.00 (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Bass Street Moline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Bass Street Moline, LLC
Represented By: Dale G Haake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Steven Wallace
Represented By: Steven M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Sabrina M Petesch
Represented By: Jamie Fowler Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?