Peoria Day Surgery Center v. OSF Healthcare System

Case Number: 1:2006cv01236
Filed: September 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
Presiding Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Mihm
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/30/09. 191 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SFMC's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in regard to Counts III, IV, VI, and VII. SFMCs Motion for Summary Judgment is denied in regard to Counts I, II, and V. (SM, ilcd)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 4/28/09 denying 170 Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Expert Opinions. (SM, ilcd)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Instanter Second Amended Complaint to Conform the Pleadings to Discovery 169 be allowed in part and denied in part. See written order. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2009. (LB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoria Day Surgery Center v. OSF Healthcare System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?