Lowinger et al v. Oberhelman et al
Plaintiff: Lowinger, Issek FUCHS and Robert LOWINGER
Defendant: Oberhelman, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON and Steven H WUNNING
Case Number: 1:2015cv01109
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
County: Peoria
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 63 MANDATE of USCA as to #60 Notice of Appeal (18-1863) filed by Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (KB, ilcd)
April 20, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA regarding #60 Notice of Appeal, filed by Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. USCA Case Number 18-1863. (ED, ilcd)
April 20, 2018 Filing 61 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals regarding #60 Notice of Appeal. (LN, ilcd)
April 19, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #57 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, #40 Order, by Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0753-2819141. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Sara Darrow on 3/26/2018 striking #59 Judgment as duplicative. (ED, ilcd)
March 26, 2018 Filing 59 STRICKEN: JUDGMENT entered. (ED, ilcd) Modified on 3/26/2018 to strike document as duplicate (ED, ilcd).
March 23, 2018 Filing 58 JUDGMENT entered on 3/23/2018. (LN, ilcd)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 22, 2018. Defendants' #49 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Defendants' #55 Motion for Leave to File a Reply is DENIED. Plaintiffs' #44 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the case. (AK, ilcd)
September 29, 2017 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #55 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion To Dismiss (Renewed) filed by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion To Dismiss (Renewed) by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 9/29/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ducayet, James)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on August 28, 2017. Defendants' #53 Motion for Leave to File a Reply does not include a copy of the proposed Reply. Additionally, Plaintiffs oppose the motion and point out that generally a reply's argument section, in the context of summary judgment motions, should only address new matters raised in the response and should not exceed five pages in length. Defendants have not identified what new matters raised in the response justify a 20-page reply. Defendants' Motion #53 is DENIED. Defendants may file another motion for leave, by September 15, 2017, if they attach the proposed reply and it complies with Local Rule 7.1(D)(3)(b), (5), which the Court applies to motions for leave to file a reply. (HR, ilcd)
August 18, 2017 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion re #53 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. (Abraham, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 8/29/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ducayet, James)
August 11, 2017 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. (Abraham, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on August 3, 2017. The parties' agreed #51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED. Plaintiffs must file their response by August 11, 2017. The parties' joint #48 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Defendants' memorandum in support of the motion to dismiss and Plaintiffs' memorandum in response will be limited to 25 pages each.(RS1, ilcd)
August 1, 2017 Filing 51 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #50 Memorandum by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. Responses due by 8/15/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2017 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM In Support of re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ducayet, James)
June 16, 2017 Filing 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 6/30/2017 (Ducayet, James)
June 13, 2017 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 6/27/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Umar, Nilofer)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Deem the Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint corrected Nunc Pro Tunc. See Written Order for amendments to paragraphs 25, 54 and 89. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/7/17. (WG, ilcd)
June 6, 2017 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #44 Amended Complaint, NUNC PRO TUNC, by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. Responses due by 6/20/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #45 Motion to establish a briefing schedule. Defendant's Motion to dismiss is due by 6/16/2017; Responses due by 8/4/2017. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/16/17. (WG, ilcd)
May 15, 2017 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to Establish A Briefing Schedule by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 5/30/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Heil, John)
May 12, 2017 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING, filed by Robert LOWINGER, Issek FUCHS. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Verification, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Certificate of Service)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER GRANTING #43 Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File a Redacted Version of the Amended Complaint After Conferring with Defendants. The Plaintiffs hereby have until 05/12/17 to file the parties agreed upon Redacted Version of the Amended Complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 05/02/2017.
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding #41 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal MOOT in light of their subsequent #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Redacted Version of the Amended Complaint After Conferring with Defendants. The Clerks Office is hereby directed to STRIKE #42 Plaintiffs proposed sealed document in light of #43 as well. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 05/02/2017. (RT, ilcd)
April 28, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File A REDACTED VERSION OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AFTER CONFERRING WITH DEFENDANTS by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. Responses due by 5/12/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2017 Filing 42 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Certificate of Service)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal AMENDED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. Responses due by 5/12/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Abraham, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2017: #3 Certificate of Service) (LN, ilcd).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on April 7, 2017. The Court replaces the last sentence on page 11 of the original order with the following sentence that can be found on pages 11-12 of the Amended Order: "Defendants properly distinguish Plaintiffs' reliance on Ausikaitis because in that case, the parties agreed the Delaware statute of limitations applied. Ausikaitis, 962 F. Supp. 2d at 673." (HR, ilcd)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 31, 2017. The Board's decision to defer its investigation is protected by the business judgment rule and Plaintiffs' complaint is therefore premature. Defendants' #22 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and WITH LEAVE TO REFILE. If Plaintiffs choose to file an amended complaint, they are directed to do so by April 28, 2017. Defendants' #25 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's #28 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' #35 Motion to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Brief is GRANTED. (RS1, ilcd)
November 15, 2016 Filing 38 BRIEF in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Strike #34 Brief, AND, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO FILE A [PROPOSED] RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL FILING by Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. (Ducayet, James)
November 9, 2016 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT re #35 MOTION to Strike #34 Brief, AND, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO FILE A [PROPOSED] RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL FILING, #36 Memorandum by Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2016 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM In Support re #35 MOTION to Strike #34 Brief, AND, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO FILE A [PROPOSED] RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL FILING by Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. (Abraham, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2016 Filing 35 MOTION to Strike #34 Brief, AND, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO FILE A [PROPOSED] RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL FILING by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. Responses due by 11/28/2016 (Abraham, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2016 Filing 34 BRIEF Supplemental Brief re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ducayet, James)
October 7, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gary Steven Graifman on behalf of Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Graifman, Gary)
October 5, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present via phone by Attys J. Abraham/J. Malvik/J. Ducayet/J. Heil Jr./N. Umar for a Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2016. Discussion held re Defendants' #29 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery. Oral Arguments heard. For reasons stated on the record, Court GRANTS the Motion #29 . Court informs parties of discovery dispute resolution procedure. If a dispute arises between the parties on any discovery issue, they are directed to promptly confer and, if said conference does not resolve the dispute, to contact the Court within 24 hours to schedule a hearing to resolve the dispute (Tape #PR-C: 3:04.) (SL, ilcd)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court grants #32 Motion for Leave to File. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 09/26/16. (MK1, ilcd)
September 23, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion for a Protective Order by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File a Reply)(Ducayet, James)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Setting Motion Hearing in re #29 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2016 at 3:00 PM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/13/16. (WG, ilcd)
September 12, 2016 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. (Malvik, John)
August 25, 2016 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery by Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ducayet, James)
August 25, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (Ducayet, James)
August 22, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief Instanter by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. Responses due by 9/9/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed sur-reply brief)(Malvik, John)
August 9, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 4/15/2016, before Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Court Reporter/Transcriber J. Johnson, Telephone number 309-573-0378. Transcript purchased by:John Heil, Jr.. IMPORTANT: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Motion of Requested Redactions shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this motion will be restricted to the Court and the attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Motion are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public, without redaction, 90 days from the date initially filed. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may view the transcript at the Clerk's Office public terminal or contact the Court Reporter for purchase. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2016. (TK, ilcd)
August 9, 2016 Filing 26 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Amendment to #25 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Attached is Defendants' Proposed Reply Memorandum. (Ducayet, James)
July 27, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Responses due by 7/29/2016. (LN, ilcd)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on July 26, 2016. Plaintiff shall file any response to defendant's #25 motion for leave to file a reply by July 29, 2016. (JP, ilcd)
July 25, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 8/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File a Reply)(Ducayet, James)
July 22, 2016 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Malvik Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A - C, #3 Supplement Certificate of Service, #4 Supplement Service List)(Malvik, John)
June 16, 2016 Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Per 4/15/16 minute entry the Response is due by 7/22/2016 (WG, ilcd)
June 15, 2016 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ducayet, James)
June 15, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 7/5/2016 (Ducayet, James)
April 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Parties present via telephone by Attys Abraham/Malvik/Ducayet/Heil for Status Conference held on 4/15/2016. Discussion held regarding setting a schedule. Defendants to respond or otherwise plead on or before 6/15/16. Plaintiff to respond to any dispositive motions on or before 7/22/16. No discovery schedule to be set at this time. However, parties have leave to file a motion seeking a discovery schedule should they believe a schedule is necessary. (Tape #PRC: 10:44 am.) (FDT, ilcd)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Status Conference set for Friday, 4/15/2016 at 10:45 AM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/29/16. (WG, ilcd)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 28, 2016. Defendants' #16 motion to stay is DENIED.(JP, ilcd)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on September 21, 2015. Plaintiffs in a related action, No. 1:13-cv-01104-SLD-JEH, filed a motion to consolidate this case with that one. The Court DENIES the motion to consolidate, in accordance with the attached Order, which has also been filed on the other case's docket.(JP, ilcd)
September 15, 2015 Filing 19 BRIEF Defendants' Reply in Support re #16 MOTION to Stay the Action by Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. (Carlson, Walter)
August 25, 2015 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Stay the Action filed by Plaintiffs Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Abraham, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2015 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Stay the Action filed by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. (Carlson, Walter)
August 11, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay the Action by Defendants Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING. Responses due by 8/28/2015 (Carlson, Walter)
June 17, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jeffrey Simon Abraham on behalf of Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER (Abraham, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Proposed Responsive Pleading Schedule and approves it. Accordingly: 1) the Defendants' responsive pleading is due the earlier of a) 30 days from the date the Court resolves the pending Motion to Consolidate, or b) 60 days from the date of the Stipulation filed 6/12/2015; and 2) should the Defendants file a motion with respect to the Complaint, including a motion to dismiss, a) the Plaintiffs will have 30 days to file their response to the motion, and b) the Defendants will have 21 days in which to file a reply to the Plaintiff's response. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/15/2015. (KZ, ilcd)
June 12, 2015 Filing 14 STIPULATION Joint Proposed Responsive Pleading Schedule by Caterpillar Inc, Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING.. (Carlson, Walter)
June 10, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nilofer Ibrahim Umar on behalf of Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING (Umar, Nilofer)
June 10, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James Wallace Ducayet on behalf of Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING (Ducayet, James)
June 10, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Walter C Carlson on behalf of Luis De LEON, Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp, Steven H WUNNING (Carlson, Walter)
June 8, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Timothy L Bertschy on behalf of All Defendants (Bertschy, Timothy)
June 8, 2015 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Status conference set 6/25/15 at 10:45 AM is CANCELLED. (WG, ilcd)
June 8, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John P Heil, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Heil, John)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Status Conference set for 6/25/2015 at 10:45 AM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Status hearing is set to check the status of the case due to the answer ddl of 5/13/15 being passed. Entered on 6/4/15. (WG, ilcd)
April 27, 2015 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert LOWINGER, Issek FUCHS. Steven H WUNNING served on 4/22/2015, answer due 5/13/2015. (Malvik, John)
April 27, 2015 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert LOWINGER, Issek FUCHS. Edward J Rapp served on 4/22/2015, answer due 5/13/2015. (Malvik, John)
April 27, 2015 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert LOWINGER, Issek FUCHS. Douglas R Oberhelman served on 4/22/2015, answer due 5/13/2015. (Malvik, John)
April 27, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert LOWINGER, Issek FUCHS. Caterpillar Inc served on 4/22/2015, answer due 5/13/2015. (Malvik, John)
April 14, 2015 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Caterpillar Inc. Original mailed to Plaintiff's Attorney to effect service. (ED, ilcd)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 3/23/2015: As noted in Text Order entered by U.S. District Judge Joe Billy McDade transferring this case to U.S. District Judge Sara Darrow, this case is related to Case No. 13-cv-1104 pending in this District. Pursuant to Local Rule 42.1, this later-filed case is transferred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley, who is also assigned to related Case No. 13-cv-1104, and related cases, 13-cv-1141, 13-cv-1509, and 13-cv-1344.(JRK, ilcd)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/30/2015: The Court has determined that this case is related to Case Number 13-cv-1104, pending in this district before Judge Darrow. Pursuant to Local Rule 42.1, this later-filed case is transferred to Judge Darrow.(JRK, ilcd)
March 19, 2015 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT to include civil cover sheet against All Defendants, filed by Robert LOWINGER, Issek FUCHS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malvik, John)
March 17, 2015 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Issek FUCHS, Robert LOWINGER. (Malvik, John)
March 17, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2032635.), filed by Caterpillar Inc, Robert LOWINGER, Issek FUCHS. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Verification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Malvik, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowinger et al v. Oberhelman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lowinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issek FUCHS
Represented By: Jeffrey Simon Abraham
Represented By: Gary Steven Graifman
Represented By: John Malvik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert LOWINGER
Represented By: Jeffrey Simon Abraham
Represented By: Gary Steven Graifman
Represented By: John Malvik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oberhelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R Oberhelman
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J Rapp
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis De LEON
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven H WUNNING
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?