Rahman v. Methodist Health Services Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Dr Saadur Rahman
Defendant: Proctor Health Care Incorporated, Methodist Health Services Corporation and Pekin Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 1:2018cv01290
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
County: Peoria
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Settlement Papers due by 10/1/2018. (LN, ilcd)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on August 24, 2018. The parties have reported the case as settled. The parties are hereby directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by October 1, 2018. All pending deadlines and hearings are vacated, to be reset if necessary. (AK, ilcd)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Methodist Health Services Corporation, Pekin Memorial Hospital, Proctor Health Care Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Fischer, Ashley)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Methodist Health Services Corporation, Pekin Memorial Hospital, Proctor Health Care Incorporated. Responses due by 9/7/2018 (Fischer, Ashley)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Katharine M O'Connor on behalf of All Defendants (O'Connor, Katharine)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ashley E Fischer on behalf of All Defendants (Fischer, Ashley)
August 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Responses due by 8/24/2018. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2018 at 9:30 a.m. in the Rock Island Courtroom before Judge Sara Darrow. (LN, ilcd)
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew B Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Matthew)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Adam P Chaddock on behalf of All Defendants (Chaddock, Adam)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on August 6, 2018. The parties have filed an #6 agreed motion to reschedule the hearing on the #4 motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction and to set deadlines for briefing on the #4 motion. The request to reschedule the hearing is GRANTED. The hearing set for August 6, 2018 at 1:30 PM is VACATED. The parties have asked to reschedule the hearing for the week of August 27, 2018. The Court is presiding over a trial that begins on August 27. The hearing is therefore set for the next available time, Wednesday September 5, 2018 at 9:30 AM in the Rock Island Courthouse. Defendants shall file a response to the #4 motion by August 24, 2018. Any reply shall be filed by August 31, 2018. (AK, ilcd)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Hearing re Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, Order on Motion for Hearing,, #4 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Saadur Rahman. Responses due by 8/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed agreed order)(Burt Tee, Jennifer)
August 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2018 at 1:30 p.m. in the Rock Island Courtroom before Judge Sara Darrow. (LN, ilcd)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on August 2, 2018. The #5 motion requesting a hearing is GRANTED. Hearing on the #4 Emergency Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction set for Monday August 6, 2018 at 1:30 PM in the Rock Island Courthouse. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order, the #4 and #5 motions, and the #1 Complaint on Defendants and their counsel. If Defendants desire to file a written response to the #4 motion, they can do so by August 6, 2018 at 9:00 AM. (AK, ilcd)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #4 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Saadur Rahman. Responses due by 8/16/2018 (Burt Tee, Jennifer)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on August 2, 2018. Plaintiff contacted Chambers about scheduling a hearing. Plaintiff is directed to file a motion requesting a hearing, and in the motion, clarify whether he is proceeding under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(1) or whether he intends to give notice of the motion for a temporary restraining order to Defendants. If intending to proceed without notice, Plaintiff must comply with Rule 65(b)(1). (AK, ilcd)
August 1, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Sara Darrow. Judge Michael M. Mihm no longer assigned to the case. (FDS, ilcd)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Saadur Rahman. Responses due by 8/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Burt Tee, Jennifer)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER. Judge Michael Mihm disqualifies and recuses himself from participation in this matter. Pursuant to recusal procedures for the Central District of Illinois, this matter is reassigned to Judge Sara Darrow for further proceedings. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 08/01/2018. (BA, ilcd)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew J Sheahin on behalf of Saadur Rahman (Sheahin, Matthew)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jennifer S Burt Tee on behalf of Saadur Rahman (Burt Tee, Jennifer)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2893901.), filed by Saadur Rahman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burt Tee, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahman v. Methodist Health Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proctor Health Care Incorporated
Represented By: Ashley E Fischer
Represented By: Matthew B Smith
Represented By: Adam P Chaddock
Represented By: Katharine M O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Methodist Health Services Corporation
Represented By: Ashley E Fischer
Represented By: Matthew B Smith
Represented By: Adam P Chaddock
Represented By: Katharine M O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pekin Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Ashley E Fischer
Represented By: Matthew B Smith
Represented By: Adam P Chaddock
Represented By: Katharine M O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Saadur Rahman
Represented By: Matthew J Sheahin
Represented By: Jennifer S Burt Tee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?