Trenkle v. Kubota Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Trenkle
Defendant: Kubota Corporation, Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation and Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01327
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
2 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Chief Judge James E. Shadid added. Judge Joe Billy McDade no longer assigned to case. (FDS, ilcd)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court has determined this case is related to Case Number 18-cv-1207, pending in this district before Chief Judge Shadid. Pursuant to Local Rule 42.1, this later-filed case is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Shadid. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 09/13/2018. (JR, ilcd)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Patrick S O'Shaughnessy on behalf of Joseph Trenkle (O'Shaughnessy, Patrick)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2923126.), filed by Joseph Trenkle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Interest, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Janssen, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trenkle v. Kubota Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Trenkle
Represented By: Jay H Janssen
Represented By: Patrick S O'Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?