JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association v. DeGuiseppi

Appellee: Richard A DeGuiseppi
Appellant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 1:2018cv01457
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. Appellee Brief due by 3/4/2019. (Cahill, Edward)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 +++ SEALED -- TRANSCRIPT (SAG, ilcd)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal and Briefing Schedule. Appellant Brief due by 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Claim)(SAG, ilcd)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-80923., filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association v. DeGuiseppi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard A DeGuiseppi
Represented By: W Edgar Weer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Edward Henry Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?