Nolan v. United States of America
Petitioner: Aldridge Nolan
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01020
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Respondent's Motion to File Presentence Report Under Seal. The Court notes that #5 contains the sealed presentence report and hereby GRANTS #4 , Respondent's Motion. Entered by Senior Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/26/2019. (RT, ilcd)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(Klein, Kimberly)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Respondent United States of America. Responses due by 3/12/2019 (Klein, Kimberly)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion for Leave to Bifurcate its Response filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Cover Page, #2 Appendix Pages 50-90)(Klein, Kimberly)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/4/2019. The Court is in receipt of #1 , the Petitioner's Petition brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. The Court orders the Respondent to respond to the Petitioner's 2241 Petition within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this text order (Response due by 2/26/2019). (RT, ilcd) Modified on 2/6/2019 to correct clerical errors (JRK, ilcd).
February 1, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626033762 (SAG, ilcd)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Senior Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/22/2019: Petitioner has filed a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, but has not paid the $5 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order (by 2/13/2019), Petitioner must pay the $5 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Petitioner will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (RT, ilcd)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Aldridge Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(FDS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolan v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kimberly A Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aldridge Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?