United States of America v. Basham et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Morrissa Ice-Klein, City of El Paso, Personal Finance Company, LLC and Lance Basham
Case Number: 1:2019cv01038
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. City of El Paso waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Klein, Kimberly)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lance Basham, Personal Finance Company, LLC. (VH, ilcd)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: GRANTING #7 , Plaintiff's Motion For Order For Service by Publication. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to the extent that it requests to proceed with service of the Defendant via publication for not less than three (3) successive weeks pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the relevant Illinois Compiled Statutes. Entered by Senior Judge Michael M. Mihm on 3/8/19. (RT, ilcd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Order for Service by Publication by Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 3/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Klein, Kimberly)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Personal Finance Company, LLC on February 6, 2019. (Klein, Kimberly)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to City of El Paso on February 6, 2019. (Klein, Kimberly)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Morrissa Ice-Klein on February 6, 2019. (Klein, Kimberly)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Lance Bashamn on February 6, 2019. (Klein, Kimberly)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of foreclosure by United States of America. (VH, ilcd)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VH, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Basham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrissa Ice-Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of El Paso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Finance Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Basham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kimberly A Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?