Hawk v. Illinois Department of Human Services

Appellee: Illinois Department of Human Services
Appellant: Shelly R Hawk
Case Number: 1:2019cv01041
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT entered. (RK, ilcd)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Stay; granting #4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and this action is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 3/8/2019. See full Order attached.(RK, ilcd)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant Shelly R Hawk. (Weer, W)
March 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 3/8/2019 (JS, ilcd)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: Appellant Hawk is directed to file its overdue response to Appellee's Motion #4 to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on or before 3/8/2019. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 3/4/2019. (SJP, ilcd)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal and Briefing Schedule Appellant Brief due by 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appeal package)(RK, ilcd)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Stay Appellant's and Apellee's Brief filed by Appellee Illinois Department of Human Services. (Pisula, Teresa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Appellee Illinois Department of Human Services. Responses due by 3/1/2019 (Pisula, Teresa)
February 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #3 MOTION to Stay Appellant's and Apellee's Brief. Responses due by 2/21/2019 (JS, ilcd)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court, sua sponte, shortens Appellee's Response deadline to Appellant's Motion #3 to Stay to 2/21/2019. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 2/14/2019. (SJP, ilcd)
February 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley no longer assigned to case. (TK, ilcd)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Appellant's and Apellee's Brief by Appellant Shelly R Hawk. Responses due by 2/26/2019 (Weer, W)
February 8, 2019 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal and Briefing Schedule. Appellant Brief due by 3/11/2019. (RK, ilcd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION UNREDACTED (RK, ilcd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-81809, filed by Shelly R Hawk.(RK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawk v. Illinois Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Illinois Department of Human Services
Represented By: Teresa Isabella Pisula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shelly R Hawk
Represented By: W Edgar Weer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?