Jordan v. Bloomington Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Jerome Jordan
Defendant: Bloomington Police Department, McLean County Sheriff's Office, John Doe and McLean County States Attorney Office
Case Number: 1:2019cv01042
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/18/19. Plaintiff's complaint is hereby dismissed with leave to plead over. The plaintiff may file an amended complaint, within 30 days of this order that complies with the Court's instructions. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or follow the court's specific instructions, his case may be dismissed. The clerk is directed to provide the plaintiff with a blank complaint form to assist him. (TC, ilcd)
March 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/11/2019 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Merit Review Hearing not held. Plaintiff is unavailable for the call. Written order to be entered. (JMB, ilcd)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of evidence for case by Thomas Jerome Jordan. (TC, ilcd) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/27/19 with redacted version) (TC, ilcd).
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 **VACATED** Telephone WRIT issued for Thomas Jerome Jordan for merit review hearing on 3/11/19 at 10:40 AM. (Writ mailed to Plaintiff at McLean County Detention Facility and to McLean County Detention Facility Records Dept.) (TC, ilcd) Modified on 2/27/19 to show writ **VACATED** as Plaintiff was paroled and mailed to McLean County Detention Facility (TC, ilcd).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 2/21/19. A merit review hearing is set for Monday, March 11, 2019, at 10:40 a.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (TC, ilcd)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff to the Court re: trust fund balance. (TC, ilcd)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/14/19 granting #2 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (TC, ilcd)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Thomas Jerome Jordan. (TC, ilcd)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Letter requesting Trust Fund Ledgers from Clerk of the Court. (KE, ilcd)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Thomas Jerome Jordan.(KE, ilcd)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Jerome Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Bloomington Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jerome Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomington Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLean County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLean County States Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?