Freno v. Kallis
Petitioner: Steven D. Freno
Respondent: Warden Kallis
Case Number: 1:2019cv01058
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 4/10/2019 granting #5 Respondent's Motion to Seal Presentence Investigation Report. Document #4 will remain under seal. (KB, ilcd)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Presentence Report by Respondent Warden Kallis. Responses due by 4/23/2019 (Klein, Kimberly)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Klein, Kimberly)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Warden Kallis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Klein, Kimberly)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 3/20/2019. The Court has reviewed this Petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243, 2241, and Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Proceedings for the United States District Courts, and orders Respondent to file an answer, motion, or other response, within twenty-one (21) days after service of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall serve upon Respondent, or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon its attorney, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Petitioner shall include with the original paper to be filed with the Clerk of the Court a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of any document was mailed to Respondent or its counsel. Any paper received by this Court that has not been filed with the Clerk or that fails to include a certificate of service will be disregarded by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner immediately notify the Court of any change in his mailing address. Failure to notify the Court of any change in mailing address will result in dismissal of this lawsuit, with prejudice. (LN, ilcd)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Steven D. Freno. (LN, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freno v. Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven D. Freno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Kallis
Represented By: Kimberly A Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?