Roman v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Luis Roman
Defendant: C/O Vinson, . Ellis, Riliwan Ojelade, Andrew Tilden, Jonathan Michelin, Michael P Melvin, Joseph Davis, Travis N Devries, John R Baldwin, Moorland, . Pina, Jackson and Wexford Health Source Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01104
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Subpoenas (McNaught, Karen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Karen L McNaught on behalf of Riliwan Ojelade, Andrew Tilden (McNaught, Karen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Conflict of Interest Do to Defense Counsel Alan Remy Taborga Being Assigned to Plaintiff Prior Civil Suit (JMB, ilcd)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Remy Taborga on behalf of Joseph Davis, Travis N Devries,. Ellis, Jackson, Jonathan Michelin, Moorland,. Pina (Taborga, Remy)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Tilden, Pina, Ojelade, Moorland, Michelin, Jackson, Ellis, Devries, Davis on 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver Pina, #2 Waiver Ojelade, #3 Waiver Moorland, #4 Waiver Michelin, #5 Waiver Jackson, #6 Waiver Ellis, #7 Waiver Devries, #8 Waiver Davis)(JMB, ilcd)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 5/17/2019. (JMB, ilcd) (Main Document 12 replaced on 5/17/2019) (JMB, ilcd).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 5/17/2019. This case is in the process of service. The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The Clerk is directed to terminate John R. Baldwin, Michael P. Melvin, C/O Vinson and Wexford Health Sources, Inc. as defendants. Plaintiff's motion for jury instruction regarding spoliation of evidence is denied with leave to renew at the appropriate time. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/2/2019 1:40:24 PM ]. File Size [ 2487 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:11 ]. (admin).
May 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 5/2/2019 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by the Plaintiff Luis Roman by telephone. Merit Review Hearing held. Allegations of the complaint discussed. Written order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C: 1:40PM.) (JMB, ilcd)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 Telephone WRIT issued for the Merit Review Hearing set for 5/2/2019 at 1:30 p.m. Writ faxed and mailed to Hill Correctional Center. (JMB, ilcd)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 4/23/2019. A merit review hearing is set for May 2, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (JMB, ilcd)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/11/2019. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel #3 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after conducting a merit review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives a merit review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (JMB, ilcd)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Luis Roman. (KE, ilcd) Modified on 3/29/2019 from Hill CC (KM, ilcd).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/29/2019 granting #4 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff`s trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (KE, ilcd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER from Pontiac CC. by Luis Roman (JMB, ilcd)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting trust fund ledgers. (JMB, ilcd)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to attached spoliation of evidence motion by Plaintiff Luis Roman. Responses due by 4/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents)(JMB, ilcd)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Luis Roman.(JMB, ilcd)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Luis Roman. Responses due by 4/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JMB, ilcd)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(JMB, ilcd)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis Roman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons)(JMB, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2019: #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (JMB, ilcd). Modified on 3/26/2019 to show exhibits added after the complaint was filed. (JMB, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Ellis
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riliwan Ojelade
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Tilden
Represented By: Karen L McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Michelin
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Davis
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis N Devries
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moorland
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Pina
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Represented By: Remy Taborga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Source Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?