Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01148
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc. waiver sent on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (McLean, Matthew)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: In light of the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #4 in which it states that venue is proper in the Central District of Illinois, Rock Island Division, the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Rock Island Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. See 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Local Rule 40.1. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/2/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc., filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(McLean, Matthew)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 5/1/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (McLean, Matthew)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3094362.), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(McLean, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Matthew S McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?