Jordan v. Kennedy et al
Petitioner: Pierre Jordan
Respondent: Kwane Raoul and Teri Kennedy
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv01188
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF LIVE, Ver 6.2.2 as case 1:19-cv-03969, filed 06/13/2019. (KM, ilcd)
June 13, 2019 Case was electronically submitted to the transferee court to the ND/IL. (TC, ilcd)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/13/19. The court has reviewed the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus #5 filed by Petitioner in this case. Petitioner's conviction originated in Cook County, Illinois, which is located in the Northern District of Illinois. Therefore, the clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Northern District. (TC, ilcd)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Pierre Jordan. (TC, ilcd)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Pierre Jordan. (TC, ilcd)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Remark: Pursuant to the Court's Order d/e #2 attached is the form to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (JMB, ilcd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00582. .
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to United States District Court Central District of Illinois. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/4/2019. (anp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Pierre Jordan.(JMB, ilcd)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Your case number is 19-cv-582-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $5.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP).(jsm2)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Pierre Jordan.(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kwane Raoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Teri Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pierre Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?