Rowe v. MBM Associates Inc

Plaintiff: Willie Rowe
Defendant: Select Remedy, Select Staffing, M.B.M Associates, Inc, d/b/a and MBM Associates Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01207
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Eric I Long
3 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/30/2019. Pursuant to Notice for Voluntary Dismissal #7 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this matter is hereby terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot and all scheduled deadlines and court settings are vacated.(JMB, ilcd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Pretrial Order of Dismissal by Willie Rowe. (Coghlan, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Willie Rowe. Responses due by 8/12/2019 (Coghlan, John)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/26/2019. At the parties' request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for August 1, 2019, is RESCHEDULED to August 15, 2019, at 11:30 A.M. by telephone from Urbana (Court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (JMB, ilcd)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/26/2019. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #6 and pursuant to the Order #2 scheduling this matter for a Rule 16 hearing conference by personal appearance, the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference. The Court will initiate the call.(JMB, ilcd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by MBM Associates Inc. (Cockroft, Andrew)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/17/2019. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #5 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended to July 29, 2019. (JMB, ilcd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (UNOPPOSED) by Defendant MBM Associates Inc. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (Cockroft, Andrew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew Randall Cockroft on behalf of All Defendants (Cockroft, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/25/19. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #3 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 7/19/19. (TC, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (UNOPPOSED) by Defendant MBM Associates Inc. Responses due by 7/9/2019 (DeGroff, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/20/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 6/20/2019. On June 19, 2019, Defendant removed this action from the Kankakee County Circuit Court to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441, a case from a state court "may be removed by the defendant or the defendants, to the district court of the United States for the district and division embracing the place where such action is pending." As set forth in this Court's Local Rule 40.1(D), Kankakee County falls within the Urbana Division of the Central District of Illinois. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the Urbana Division for further proceedings. As Plaintiff's counsel is not yet listed as an attorney of record in this federal case, the Clerk is further DIRECTED to forward a copy of this order to the email address listed on the certificate of service.(VH, ilcd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Kankakee County, case number 2018L-138 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3131667), filed by Select Remedy, Select Staffing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeGroff, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KM, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. MBM Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Remedy
Represented By: Christopher J DeGroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Staffing
Represented By: Christopher J DeGroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B.M Associates, Inc, d/b/a
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBM Associates Inc
Represented By: Andrew Randall Cockroft
Represented By: Christopher J DeGroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Rowe
Represented By: John Shea Coghlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?