Francis v. Goodwin
Petitioner: Jean-Pierre Martin Francis
Respondent: United States of America and John Goodwin
Case Number: 1:2019cv01254
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Jean-Pierre Martin Francis. (TK, ilcd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Jean-Pierre Martin Francis (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Forwarded to Middle District of Florida for docketing in case 3:19-cv-00883.) (KM, ilcd)
July 31, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 3:19-cv-00883, filed 07/29/2019. (KM, ilcd)
July 29, 2019 Case transferred to the Middle District of Florida. (JS, ilcd)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/29/2019. IS THEREFORE ORDERED:1. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to recode this case as filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, substitute John Godwin for the United States as Respondent in this matter. 2. This case is TRANSFERRED in the interest of justice to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JS, ilcd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jean-Pierre Martin Francis.(JS, ilcd) Modified on 7/29/2019 (JS, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kimberly A Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jean-Pierre Martin Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?