Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. Hillsboro Energy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Foresight Energy GP LLC, Hillsboro Energy, LLC, Foresight Energy LP, Foresight Energy Service LLC and Foresight Energy LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01257
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
2 Judge: Richard Mills
3 Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company. Foresight Energy GP LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Foresight Energy LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Foresight Energy LP waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Foresight Energy Service LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Hillsboro Energy, LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Dunne, Roderick)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Foresight Energy GP LLC ; Foresight Energy LLC; Foresight Energy LP; Foresight Energy Service LLC and Hillsboro Energy, LLC and forwarded to the Plaintiff's attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Springfield Division of the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/6/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Houston Specialty Insurance Company . (Dunne, Roderick)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff's Complaint #1 does not state, as part of the statement of jurisdiction, the basis for filing in the Peoria Division of the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. See Local Rule 40.1(F). The Complaint includes allegations that the underlying lawsuit is pending in Montgomery County, Illinois, and the allegations of the Complaint, generally, do not on their face make clear that this case is properly filed in the Peoria Division. Montgomery County is located in the Springfield Division. See Local Rule 40.1(B). Therefore, the Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing by 8/5/2019 why this case should not be transferred to the Springfield Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/29/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates by Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Dunne, Roderick)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Roderick T Dunne on behalf of Houston Specialty Insurance Company (Dunne, Roderick)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3159007.), filed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. Hillsboro Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Roderick T Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foresight Energy GP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsboro Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foresight Energy LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foresight Energy Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foresight Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?