Lundeen v. GC Services, LP
Plaintiff: Tracy Lundeen
Defendant: GC Services, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv01259
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Settlement (Cozmyk, Peter)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dft GC Services, LP answer due 9/23/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/3/19. (WG, ilcd)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant GC Services, LP. Responses due by 9/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Felkins, Jill)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Rachel Nicole Laurel on behalf of GC Services, LP (Laurel, Rachel)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jill M Felkins on behalf of GC Services, LP (Felkins, Jill)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Lundeen. GC Services, LP served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Cozmyk, Peter)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GC Services, LP. (JRK, ilcd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GC Services, LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3159470.), filed by Tracy Lundeen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cozmyk, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundeen v. GC Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Services, LP
Represented By: Jill M Felkins
Represented By: Rachel Nicole Laurel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lundeen
Represented By: Peter Cozmyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?