RooR International BV et al v. Haze Tobacco et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc., RooR International BV and Sream Inc
Defendant: Haze Tobacco and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01279
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Eric I Long
3 Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 24626008986. (DS, ilcd)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Urbana Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/27/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc. . (Langone, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark by RooR International BV and Sream, Inc. (RK, ilcd)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 alleges that venue is proper in this district under 28 U.S.C. 1391(b) because "the Defendants reside in this district, a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred in this district, and the Defendants are subject to personal jurisdiction in this Judicial District with respect to this action, and there is no other district in which the action may otherwise be brought." Local Rule 40.1 provides the divisions of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois in which complaints and subsequent filings will be filed. See Local Rule 40.1(A)-(D). The Complaint further alleges that Defendant Haze Tobacco is an Illinois corporation with its principal place of business in Manteno, Illinois. Manteno, Illinois is in Kankakee County which is in the Urbana Division. The Complaint does not state, as part of the statement of jurisdiction, the basis for filing in the Peoria Division. See Local Rule 40.1(F). In light of this, the Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause in writing, by 8/26/2019, why this case should not be transferred to the Urbana Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/20/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
August 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2019. (RK, ilcd)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/20/2019. Exhibits C [1-3] and D [1-4] attached to the Plaintiffs Complaint #1 contain original signatures. The Clerk is directed to place Exhibits C and D under seal and the Plaintiffs are directed to file redacted copies of Exhibits C and D which comply with Local Rule 5.11(A). (RK, ilcd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher V Langone on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Langone, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by RooR International BV and Sream, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. USPTO- Notice of Recordation of Assignment, #2 Exhibit B. RooR Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit C. License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D. Agreement Sream Roor international, #5 Exhibit E. Product Purchase from Defendant, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher) Modified on 8/19/2019 to correct filing also on behalf of Sream, Inc. and to correct typo(JRK, ilcd). Modified on 9/27/2019 Filing Fee $400 paid (KM, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RooR International BV et al v. Haze Tobacco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International BV
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream Inc
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haze Tobacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?